Michigan Western District Court
Judge:Jane M Beckering
Referred: Sally J Berens
Case #: 1:24-cv-00413
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 American Disability Act for Handicappers
Case Filed:Apr 24, 2024
Terminated:May 28, 2024
Case in other court:Michigan Eastern, 2:24-cv-10809
Last checked: Monday Oct 21, 2024 4:19 AM EDT
defendant
El Azteco Inc
Represented By
Garett Lee Koger
Butzel Long (ln)
contact info
Aaron Landry Davis
Butzel Long (ln)
contact info
plaintiff
Bernadette Scott
Represented By
Pete Marlin Monismith
Pete M. Monismith PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
14 14 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation and Proposed Order Tue 05/28 10:05 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL granting proposed stipulated order13 ; this matter is dismissed with prejudice; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (rmw)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
13 13 motion Stipulation and Order (Proposed-one document) Fri 05/24 3:23 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER of Dismissal with Prejudice by plaintiff Bernadette Scott (Monismith, Pete)
Related: [-]
12 12 1 pgs order Order Regarding Dismissal Papers Fri 05/24 8:58 AM
ORDER requiring dismissal papers to be filed no later than 6/7/2024; cancelling 5/30/2024 Rule 16 scheduling conference; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (rmw)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
11 11 4 pgs order Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Mon 05/06 12:35 PM
ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 5/30/2024 at 10:00 AM by telephone before District Judge Jane M. Beckering; joint status report due by 5/23/2024; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (rmw)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
10 10 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 05/03 4:11 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by El Azteco Inc (Davis, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
9 9 1 pgs order Order for Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 04/26 9:22 AM
ORDER that Defendant file a corporate disclosure statement within 7 days; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (rmw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 04/25 11:40 AM
ANSWER to complaint,1 with affirmative defenses by El Azteco Inc (Davis, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
7 7 misc Receipt of Case Notice Wed 04/24 9:01 AM
NOTICE of receipt of case (pjw)
Related: [-]
6 6 utility Case Transferred In - District Transfer Wed 04/24 8:44 AM
CASE TRANSFERRED IN from Michigan Eastern, their case number 2:24-cv-10809; the documents listed above were electronically transferred to the Western District of Michigan (pjw)
Related: [-]
utility Copies Mailed Wed 04/24 9:09 AM
Copy of Receipt of Case Notice7 sent via U.S. Mail to Pete M. Monismith (pjw)
Related: [-]
notice Attorney Appearance Wed 04/24 12:47 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Aaron Landry Davis on behalf of defendant El Azteco Inc (Davis, Aaron)
Related: [-]
notice Attorney Appearance Wed 04/24 12:48 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Garett Lee Koger on behalf of defendant El Azteco Inc (Koger, Garett)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2024
5 5 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE AND TRANSFERRING CASE to the Western District of Michigan. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (DAll) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 4/24/2024.]
Related: [-]
4 4 MOTION to Change Venue Unopposed by Bernadette Scott. (Monismith, Pete) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 4/24/2024.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
3 3 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. El Azteco Inc. served on 4/6/2024, answer due 4/29/2024. (Monismith, Pete) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 4/24/2024.]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
2 2 SUMMONS Issued for *El Azteco Inc.* (JHea) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 4/24/2024.]
Related: [-]
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at (JHea) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 4/24/2024.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT filed by Bernadette Scott against El Azteco Inc.. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9729446 - Fee: $ 405.County of 1st Plaintiff: Genesee -County Where Action Arose: Ingham - County of 1st Defendant: Ingham. Previously dismissed case: No] Possible companion case(s): None (Monismith, Pete)[Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 4/24/2024.]
Related: [-]