KHALEDI v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Melissa Damian |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-21550 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits |
Case Filed: | Apr 24, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 24, 2024 12:10 PM EDT |
Defendant
Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
|
|
Plaintiff
MARYAM KHALEDI
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report
Mon 04/29 9:54 AM
Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties Joint Scheduling Report due by 5/20/2024 Signed by Judge Melissa Damian on 4/26/2024. See attached document for full details. (pc) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Thu 04/25 1:58 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by MARYAM KHALEDI. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company served on 4/25/2024, response/answer due 5/16/2024. (Jessup, Stephen) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Wed 04/24 2:58 PM
Summons Issued as to Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (pc) |
|
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Wed 04/24 2:54 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Melissa Damian. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (pc) |
|
1 | 1
6
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/24 11:12 AM
COMPLAINT against Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17473670, filed by MARYAM KHALEDI.(Jessup, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summon(s) |