Jack v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | Robert E Blackburn |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01134 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC) |
Case Filed: | Apr 24, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge
Fri 04/26 4:19 AM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Commissioner, Social Security Administration All parties do not consent.. (Verdis, Michelle) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Entry of Appearance
Thu 04/25 12:32 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michelle C. Verdis on behalf of Commissioner, Social Security AdministrationAttorney Michelle C. Verdis added to party Commissioner, Social Security Administration(pty:dft) (Verdis, Michelle) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings - PUBLIC
Thu 04/25 9:10 AM
Utility Setting Deadlines: Commissioner, Social Security Administration answer due 6/24/2024. Text Only Entry (norlin, ) |
|
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 04/24 4:19 PM
ORDER granting2 Application To Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/24/2024.(schap, ) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Administrative Notice
Wed 04/24 1:16 PM
Administrative Notice: Social Security Case Service. Pursuant to the Letter of Agreement signed by the Clerk, U.S. District Court;U.S. Attorneys Office for the District of Colorado (USAO), and Social Security Administration (SSA), service of the initiating document(s) by the plaintiff to the SSA, the U.S. Attorney General, and USAO in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(i) is not necessary unless the court otherwise orders. A summons is not required and will not be issued. (Text Only Entry) (efoga, ) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Magistrate Judge Consent Form
Wed 04/24 1:15 PM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (efoga, ) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Case Assigned to Judge
Wed 04/24 1:14 PM
Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Text Only Entry (efoga, ) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 04/24 9:42 AM
Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. by Plaintiff Monique M. Jack. (Olinsky, Howard) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/24 9:41 AM
COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Attorney Howard D. Olinsky added to party Monique M. Jack(pty:pla), filed by Monique M. Jack.(Olinsky, Howard) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A: Notice of Unfavorable Decision, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |