Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe
California Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Linda Lopez |
Referred: | Karen S Crawford |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00737 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:0101 Copyright Infringement (definitions) |
Case Filed: | Apr 23, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 24, 2024 11:09 AM PDT |
Defendant
John Doe
|
|
Plaintiff
Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Wed 04/24 10:37 AM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (axi)(sjt) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Party With Financial Interest
Wed 04/24 10:35 AM
NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (axi) (sjt) |
|
1 | 1
9
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/24 10:33 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against John Doe ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACASDC-18786552.), filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. The new case number is 3:24-cv-737-LL-KSC. Judge Linda Lopez and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case. (Bandlow, Lincoln)(axi)(sjt) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Copyright Report [Copyright Report Mailed] |