4
|
|
4
2
pgs
order
Order Setting/Resetting/Cancelling Hearing
Thu 05/02 11:20 AM
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Scheduling Conference set for 5/14/2024 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 5/2/2024. See attached document for full details. (lbe)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
order
Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Fri 04/26 11:27 AM
ORDER SETTING CALENDAR CALL AND TRIAL DATE, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE FOR SCHEDULING MATTERS AND PRETRIAL DISCOVERY MATTERS: ( Jury Trial set for 1/27/2025 09:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Senior Judge James I. Cohn., Calendar Call set for 1/23/2025 09:00 AM before Senior Judge James I. Cohn.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle for Discovery Matters. Signed by Senior Judge James I. Cohn on 4/25/2024. See attached document for full details. (nwn)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Wed 04/24 3:30 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge James I. Cohn. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (pc)
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
cmp
Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint)
Wed 04/24 1:07 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT ) Filing fee $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17474578, filed by Independent Specialty Insurance Company.(Gonsalves, Erica) (Complaint see pg.3 of Exh.A, Answer see pg. 67 of Exh.D, Motion to Dismiss see pg. 76 of Exh.D) Modified text on 4/24/2024 (pc)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit A,
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit B,
|
| |
Att: 3
Exhibit C,
|
| |
Att: 4
Exhibit D,
|
| |
Att: 5
Civil Cover Sheet
|