Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 73.125.182.186.
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Melissa Damian |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-60683 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:0101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Apr 24, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 24, 2024 2:10 PM EDT |
Defendant
JOHN DOE
|
|
Plaintiff
Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, May 03, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 05/03 12:29 PM
ORDER granting6 Motion for Leave to Serve a Third-Party Subpoena Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference. Signed by Judge Melissa Damian on 5/3/2024. See attached document for full details. (ls) |
|
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 05/01 1:19 PM
MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third-Party Subpoena Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(Waugh, Christian) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of David Williamson, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Patrick Paige, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Susan B. Stalzer, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Proposed Order | ||
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 04/26 10:05 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC. for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Waugh, Christian) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
order
Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction - ELECTRONIC CASE
Wed 04/24 3:20 PM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (drz) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Form AO 120/121
Wed 04/24 2:46 PM
FORM AO 121 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. COPYRIGHT OFFICE. (drz) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint with Exhibits | ||
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Wed 04/24 2:40 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Melissa Damian. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (drz) |
|
1 | 1
9
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/24 1:52 PM
COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement against JOHN DOE. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17474839, filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(Waugh, Christian) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Infringement Log |