Kravitz v. Beylier
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:20-bk-32243
Lead BK case is: 4:20-bk-32243
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Marvin Isgur |
Case #: | 4:24-ap-03092 |
Nature of Suit | 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Apr 23, 2024 |
Terminated: | Dec 16, 2024 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Pierre-Jean Joseph Andre Beylier
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Peter Kravitz, As Litigation Trustee for the Litigation Trust of SpeedCast International, Ltd., et al.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Wednesday, December 18, 2024 | ||
40 | 40
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 12/18/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, December 16, 2024 | ||
39 | 39
![]() Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice of Adversary Case 4:24-ap-3092, Signed on 12/16/2024 (acj4) |
|
Friday, December 13, 2024 | ||
38 | 38
![]() Stipulation By Peter Kravitz and Defendant. Does this document include an agreed order or otherwise request that the judge sign a document? Yes. (Filed By Peter Kravitz ). (Whitesell, S.) |
|
Saturday, November 09, 2024 | ||
37 | 37
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 11/09/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, November 07, 2024 | ||
36 | 36
![]() Order Appointing Mediator, Signed on 11/7/2024 (acj4) |
|
Tuesday, November 05, 2024 | ||
35 | 35
![]() PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 11/5/2024 2:58:42 PM ]. File Size [ 5448 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:11:21 ]. (admin) |
|
34 | 34
court
Courtroom Minutes
Tue 11/05 3:22 PM
Courtroom Minutes. Time Hearing Held: 2:59 PM-3:11 PM. Appearances: Paul R. Genender for defendant. David Stone & Pieter Van Tol for the Plaintiff. As stated on the record, the Court will confer with other bankruptcy judges concerning the parties mediating. As stated on the record, deadlines and filings regarding motions to dismiss are orally abated until mediation matters are resolved. (acj4) |
|
Saturday, October 26, 2024 | ||
33 | 33
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 10/26/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, October 24, 2024 | ||
32 | 32
![]() Notice of Hearing . Filed by Peter Kravitz (Whitesell, S.) |
|
31 | 31
![]() Order on Agreed Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond, Signed on 10/24/2024 (acj4) |
|
court
Hearing Set
Thu 10/24 10:08 AM
Hearing Set by Request Parties contacted the case manager. Movant to notice all interested parties and file a certificate of service with the court. Status conference to be held on 11/5/2024 at 03:00 PM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (SierraThomasAnderson) |
||
Tuesday, October 22, 2024 | ||
30 | 30
![]() Stipulation By Peter Kravitz and Defendant. Does this document include an agreed order or otherwise request that the judge sign a document? Yes. (Filed By Peter Kravitz ). (Whitesell, S.) |
|
29 | 29
![]() Non-Opposition Motion to Withdraw Document . Filed by Plaintiff Peter Kravitz (Whitesell, S.) |
|
Thursday, October 03, 2024 | ||
28 | 28
![]() Motion To Stay. Filed by Plaintiff Peter Kravitz Hearing scheduled for 1/10/2025 at 09:00 AM at telephone conference. (Whitesell, S.) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Saturday, September 21, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 09/21/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, September 19, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
![]() Notice of Hearing . Filed by Pierre-Jean Joseph Andre Beylier (Genender, Paul) |
|
25 | 25
![]() Motion to Dismiss Case for Other Cause . Objections/Request for Hearing Due in 21 days. Filed by Defendant Pierre-Jean Joseph Andre Beylier Hearing scheduled for 12/10/2024 at 01:30 PM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (Genender, Paul) |
|
Wednesday, September 18, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
![]() Agreed Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer, Signed on 9/18/2024 (acj4) |
|
Tuesday, September 17, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
![]() Stipulation By Peter Kravitz and Defendant. Does this document include an agreed order or otherwise request that the judge sign a document? Yes. (Filed By Peter Kravitz ). (Whitesell, S.) |
|
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 08/14/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
![]() Agreed Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer, Signed on 8/12/2024 (SierraThomasAnderson) |
|
Friday, August 09, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
![]() Stipulation By Peter Kravitz and Defendant. Does this document include an agreed order or otherwise request that the judge sign a document? Yes. (Filed By Peter Kravitz ). (Whitesell, S.) |
|
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 07/12/2024. (Admin.) |
|
18 | 18
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 07/12/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, July 10, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
![]() Order, Signed on 7/10/2024 (SierraThomasAnderson) |
|
Tuesday, July 09, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
![]() Agreed Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer, Signed on 7/9/2024 (SierraThomasAnderson) |
|
Wednesday, July 03, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
![]() Stipulation By Peter Kravitz and Defendant. Does this document include an agreed order or otherwise request that the judge sign a document? Yes. (Filed By Peter Kravitz ). (Whitesell, S.) |
|
Wednesday, June 26, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 06/26/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, June 24, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Order Granting Motion for David J. Stone to Appear pro hac vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found [LINK:here] Signed on 6/24/2024. (SierraThomasAnderson) |
|
Friday, June 21, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
![]() MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for David J. Stone (Fee Paid: $100, receipt number A25378360) Filed by Plaintiff Peter Kravitz Hearing scheduled for 7/8/2024 at 12:00 PM. (Whitesell, S.) |
|
11 | 11
![]() Summons Service Executed in an Involuntary Case on Pierre-Jean Joseph Andre Beylier 6/13/2024, Answer Due 7/5/2024 (Filed By Peter Kravitz ). (Whitesell, S.) |
|
10 | 10
![]() Response to Order to Show Cause . (Filed By Peter Kravitz ) (Whitesell, S.) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, June 19, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 06/19/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, June 17, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
![]() PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 6/17/2024 11:00:10 AM ]. File Size [ 3144 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:06:33 ]. (admin) |
|
7 | 7
![]() Order to Show Cause, Signed on 6/17/2024 (SierraThomasAnderson) |
|
6 | 6
court
Courtroom Minutes
Mon 06/17 11:20 AM
Courtroom Minutes. Time Hearing Held: 11:00 AM - 11:06 AM. Appearances: none. The Court was able to reach Counsel S. Whitesell via telephone. As stated on the record, show cause order to be filed by the Court. (SierraThomasAnderson) |
|
Saturday, May 04, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 05/04/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, May 02, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Order for Conference Pre-Trial Conference set for 6/17/2024 at 11:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (tjl4) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Summons Issued on Pierre-Jean Joseph Andre Beylier Date Issued 4/24/2024. (abm4) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Request for Issuance of Summons on Pierre-Jean Joseph Andre Beylier. (Whitesell, S.) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 24-03092 Nature of Suit: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Complaint by Peter Kravitz against Pierre-Jean Joseph Andre Beylier. Fee Amount $350 (Whitesell, S.) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |