California Northern District Court
Judge:Noel Wise
Case #: 5:24-cv-02440
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 24, 2024
Last checked: Monday Oct 21, 2024 1:18 AM PDT
Defendant
Charles Liang
Represented By
Hope A. Case
Rutan & Tucker LLP
contact info
Kenneth Bartlett Jordan
Rutan & Tucker LLP
contact info
Heather Nicole Herd
Rutan And Tucker LLP
contact info
Defendant
Super Micro Computer, Inc.
Represented By
Hope A. Case
Rutan & Tucker LLP
contact info
Kenneth Bartlett Jordan
Rutan & Tucker LLP
contact info
Heather Nicole Herd
Rutan And Tucker LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Bob K Luong
Represented By
Maria Ann Bourn
Maria A. Bourn
contact info
Michael Thomas Brooks
Gomerman, Bourn & Associates
contact info
Tanya Gomerman
Law Offices Of Tanya Gomerman
contact info

GPO Aug 13 2024
ORDER GRANTING 22 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO CONTINUE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ASSOCIATED DEADLINES; AND CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FROM SEPTEMBER 19, 2024 TO DECEMBER 19, 2024. Case Management Statement due by 12/12/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/19/2024 11:00 AM in San Jose, Videoconference Only. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/13/2024. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2024)
GPO Nov 04 2024
ORDER GRANTING 17 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY ACTION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/4/2024. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2024)
GPO Feb 11 2025
ORDER DENYING 50 DEFENDANTS' SECOND ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONTINUE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ASSOCIATED DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/11/2025. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2025)

Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, April 07, 2025
60 60 misc Statement Mon 04/07 4:00 PM
Joint Statement Declining Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction re59 Order filed by Charles Liang, Super Micro Computer, Inc.. (Case, Hope)
Related: [-]