Berman v. Parfit LLC
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | William P Dimitrouleas |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-60685 |
Nature of Suit | 485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act |
Cause | 47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment |
Case Filed: | Apr 24, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 26, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 24, 2024 3:09 PM EDT |
Defendant
Parfit LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Berman
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party
Fri 04/26 11:08 AM
ORDER APPROVING VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL: re5 Plaintiff's Notice of Dismissal. The Notice [DE 5] is hereby APPROVED. This case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; and The Clerk shall CLOSE this case and DENY AS MOOT any pending motions. Closing Case. (Without Prejudice) Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 4/26/2024. See attached document for full details. (wce) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - aty
Thu 04/25 4:32 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice by Christopher Berman (Edelsberg, Scott) |
|
4 | 4
3
pgs
order
Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report
Thu 04/25 11:41 AM
ORDER REQUIRING COUNSEL TO MEET, FILE JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND JOINT DISCOVERY REPORT: Within thirty-five (35) calendar days of the filing of the first responsive pleading by the last responding defendant, unless this action is excluded under Rule 26(a)(1)(B), the parties shall file a Joint Scheduling Report and Joint Proposed Order pursuant to Local Rule 16.1.B.2. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 4/25/2024. See attached document for full details. (wce) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Wed 04/24 4:19 PM
Summons Issued as to Parfit LLC. (wce) |
|
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Wed 04/24 4:18 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (wce) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/24 2:35 PM
COMPLAINT against Parfit LLC. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17475075, filed by Christopher Berman.(Edelsberg, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summon(s) |