Dugan v. Caring Hands Assisted Living LLC
Wisconsin Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | William C Griesbach |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00493 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 24, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 24, 2024 2:11 PM CDT |
Defendant
Caring Hands Assisted Living LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Mary Dugan
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Tue 04/30 1:32 PM
Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Zoeller, David) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
misc
Notice of Electronic Filing Error
Thu 04/25 9:16 AM
NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re2 Notice of Appearance. All documents should contain the s/signature of the attorney who files the document. This document does not need to be re-filed; please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov for further guidance. (kwf) |
||
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/25 9:17 AM
Summons Issued as to Caring Hands Assisted Living LLC. (kwf) |
||
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Disclosure Statement
Wed 04/24 3:17 PM
DISCLOSURE Statement by All Plaintiffs. (Zoeller, David) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/24 1:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by David C Zoeller on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Attorney(s) appearing: Connor J. Clegg (Zoeller, David) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/24 1:02 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Mary Dugan. ( Filing Fee PAID $405 receipt number AWIEDC-4662305)(Zoeller, David) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons | ||
notice
Notice of Judge Assignment
Wed 04/24 1:05 PM
NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge William C Griesbach; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available[LINK:here.] Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl) |