California Northern District Court
Judge:Phyllis J Hamilton
Referred: Pslc Agb
Case #: 4:24-cv-02437
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 24, 2024
Terminated:Apr 29, 2024
Defendant
San Benito County Superior Court
Plaintiff
Steven Wayne Bonilla

GPO Apr 29 2024
f record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)ORDER DISMISSING MULTIPLE CASES WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 4/29/2024. (afm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses o

Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, April 29, 2024
3 3 order Judgment Mon 04/29 10:53 AM
JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 4/29/2024. (afm, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
2 2 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 04/29 10:26 AM
ORDER DISMISSING MULTIPLE CASES WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 4/29/2024. (afm, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 04/24 12:48 PM
COMPLAINT Related [+] against San Benito County Superior Court (Filing fee not paid). Filed by Steven Wayne Bonilla. (gba, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-] questing Writ of Mandate
Att: 1 Envelope