New Jersey District Court
Judge:Michael A Shipp
Referred: Rukhsanah L Singh
Case #: 3:24-cv-05587
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(a) Injunction against Misappropriation of Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Apr 24, 2024
Last checked: Monday Oct 21, 2024 4:39 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
JEFFREY ARDO
Represented By
PETER J. LAMONT
Law Offices Of Peter J. Lamont
contact info
Counter Claimant
EN GARDE DEER DEFENSE, LLC
Represented By
PETER J. LAMONT
Law Offices Of Peter J. Lamont
contact info
Counter Defendant
NEW JERSEY DEER CONTROL, LLC
Represented By
CHRISTOPHER J. MARINO
Giordano Halleran & Ciesla, PC
contact info
Defendant
JEFFREY ARDO
Represented By
PETER J. LAMONT
Law Offices Of Peter J. Lamont
contact info
Defendant
EN GARDE DEER DEFENSE, LLC
Represented By
PETER J. LAMONT
Law Offices Of Peter J. Lamont
contact info
Notice Only
NATHAN B. ZION
Plaintiff
NEW JERSEY DEER CONTROL, LLC
Represented By
CHRISTOPHER J. MARINO
Giordano Halleran & Ciesla, PC
contact info

GPO Jun 03 2024
MEMORANDUM OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 6/3/2024. (mlh)
GPO Jan 16 2025
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 1/16/2025. (amv)

Docket last updated: 59 minutes ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
47 47 2 pgs misc Letter Wed 04/30 10:40 AM
Letter from Christopher J. Marino re 46 Text Order. (MARINO, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
46 46 order Text Order Mon 03/31 8:55 AM
TEXT ORDER: The parties shall submit a joint status letter to the Court via CM/ECF by no later than April 30, 2025. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 3/31/2025. (mm)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
45 45 2 pgs misc Letter Fri 03/28 10:57 AM
Letter from Christopher J. Marino re 44 Text Order. (MARINO, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
44 44 order Text Order Tue 03/18 8:57 AM
TEXT ORDER: The parties shall file a joint letter regarding the status of this matter by no later than March 28, 2025. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 3/18/2025. (mm)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
minutes Settlement Conference Mon 03/17 4:12 PM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh: Settlement Conference held on 3/17/2025. (mm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
43 43 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 01/16 3:50 PM
ORDER Granting29 Counterclaim Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim Plaintiffs' Counterclaims without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 1/16/2025. (amv)
Related: [-]
42 42 9 pgs order Memorandum Opinion Thu 01/16 3:48 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 1/16/2025. (amv)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
41 41 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 01/03 10:56 AM
ORDER Setting Settlement Conference for 3/17/2025 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 1/3/2025. (amv)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
40 40 order Text Order Mon 12/16 11:22 AM
TEXT ORDER: For good cause shown, the discovery deadlines set in this matter are hereby held in abeyance pending the setting of a settlement conference. The parties shall proceed with completing written discovery. The Court will reset the discovery deadlines following the settlement conference, if necessary. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 12/16/2024. (mm)
Related: [-]
minutes Telephone Conference Mon 12/16 11:19 AM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh: Telephone Conference held on 12/16/2024. (mm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
39 39 2 pgs misc Letter Wed 12/11 8:52 AM
Letter from All Parties. (MARINO, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
38 38 order Text Order 1 - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 11/27 11:44 AM
TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of the letter dated 11/26/2024. Telephone Conference set for 12/2/2024, is hereby RESCHEDULED to 12/16/2024 at 11:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the call. Once all of the parties are on the line, counsel for Plaintiff shall conference in Judge Singh's Chambers at (609) 989-0502. No later than three (3) business days prior to the telephone status conference, the parties shall submit a joint status letter to the Court via CM/ECF not to exceed three (3) pages, setting forth the status of discovery and identifying any issues ripe for discussion with the Court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 11/27/2024. (mm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
37 37 1 pgs misc Letter Tue 11/26 5:23 PM
Letter from Christopher J. Marino re36 Scheduling Order. (MARINO, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
36 36 3 pgs order Scheduling Order Wed 08/28 10:37 AM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 12/2/2024 at 2:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh. Fact Discovery is to remain open through 12/15/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 8/27/2024. (mlh)
Related: [-]
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Tue 08/27 2:46 PM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh: Initial Pretrial Conference via Microsoft Teams held on 8/27/2024. (mm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
35 35 4 pgs discov Joint Discovery Plan Tue 08/13 11:45 AM
Joint Discovery Plan by NEW JERSEY DEER CONTROL, LLC.(MARINO, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
34 34 7 pgs respm Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion Fri 08/09 11:03 AM
REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by NEW JERSEY DEER CONTROL, LLC re29 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Counterclaims (MARINO, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
33 33 8 pgs respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 08/02 4:53 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition filed by JEFFREY ARDO, EN GARDE DEER DEFENSE, LLC re29 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Counterclaims (LAMONT, PETER)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
32 32 1 pgs order Order Wed 07/31 11:45 AM
LETTER ORDER granting that the 8/27/2024 scheduling conference be converted to a remote proceeding. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 7/31/2024. (kht)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
31 31 1 pgs misc Letter Tue 07/30 3:26 PM
Letter from Christopher J. Marino re30 Set Hearings, Set/Clear Flags, Order. (MARINO, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
30 30 5 pgs order ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Order Mon 07/22 1:00 PM
ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 8/27/2024 at 2:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 7/22/2024. (jdg)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 07/22 8:59 AM
Set Deadlines as to29 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Counterclaims . Motion set for 8/19/2024 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jal, )
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
29 29 2 pgs motion Dismiss Fri 07/19 2:30 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Counterclaims by NEW JERSEY DEER CONTROL, LLC. Responses due by 8/5/2024.(MARINO, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 9 pgs Brief,
Att: 2 95 pgs Certification of Christopher J. Marino,
Att: 3 2 pgs Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
28 28 2 pgs misc Letter Wed 07/17 7:06 PM
Letter from Christopher J. Marino re23 Stipulation and Order. (MARINO, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
27 27 4 pgs order Stipulation and Order Thu 07/11 4:02 PM
AMENDED STIPULATION AND DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 7/11/2024. (jal, ) (Main Document 27 replaced on 7/12/2024) (jal, ).
Related: [-]
26 26 6 pgs order Discovery Confidentiality Order Thu 07/11 3:38 PM
Discovery Confidentiality Order Filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 7/11/2024. (jal, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
25 25 misc Letter Wed 07/10 3:34 PM
Letter from Christopher J. Marino re23 Stipulation and Order.(MARINO, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 4 pgs Text of Proposed Order Amended Stipulation and Discovery,
Att: 2 6 pgs Text of Proposed Order Confidentiality Order
Friday, June 28, 2024
24 24 17 pgs answer Answer to Amended Complaint Counterclaim Fri 06/28 5:08 PM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint , First COUNTERCLAIM against NEW JERSEY DEER CONTROL, LLC by JEFFREY ARDO, EN GARDE DEER DEFENSE, LLC.(LAMONT, PETER)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
23 23 4 pgs order Stipulation and Order Tue 06/11 2:48 PM
STIPULATION AND EXPEDITED DISCOVERY ORDER that the parties shall file a joint status letter by no later than 7/1/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 6/11/2024. (kht)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
22 22 misc Stipulation Mon 06/10 4:25 PM
STIPULATION AND PROPOSED EXPEDITED DISCOVERY ORDER by NEW JERSEY DEER CONTROL, LLC. (MARINO, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
21 21 2 pgs misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Fri 06/07 4:50 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by EN GARDE DEER DEFENSE, LLC. (LAMONT, PETER)
Related: [-]
20 20 26 pgs misc Exhibit (to Document) Fri 06/07 2:05 PM
Exhibit to19 Amended Complaint (VERIFIED) by NEW JERSEY DEER CONTROL, LLC. (MARINO, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
19 19 24 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Fri 06/07 1:43 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT (VERIFIED) against JEFFREY ARDO, EN GARDE DEER DEFENSE, LLC, filed by NEW JERSEY DEER CONTROL, LLC.(MARINO, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
18 18 order Order Tue 06/04 9:50 AM
TEXT ORDER: In light of the Court's June 3, 2024 Memorandum Opinion and Order, the parties shall file a proposed schedule for expedited discovery by no later than June 10, 2024. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 6/4/2024. (mm)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion for TRO Mon 06/03 2:06 PM
ORDER denying2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 6/3/2024. (mlh)
Related: [-]
16 16 14 pgs order Memorandum Opinion Mon 06/03 2:04 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 6/3/2024. (mlh)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
15 15 13 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Mon 05/20 11:33 AM
Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint by JEFFREY ARDO, EN GARDE DEER DEFENSE, LLC.(LAMONT, PETER)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
14 14 18 pgs respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 05/10 5:50 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion filed by NEW JERSEY DEER CONTROL, LLC re2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (MARINO, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification of Christopher J. Markham
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
13 13 22 pgs respm Brief in Opposition to Motion Wed 05/08 11:44 AM
BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Defendants re2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (LAMONT, PETER)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 57 pgs Certification of Jeffrey Ardo,
Att: 2 3 pgs Exhibit 2 of Brief in Opposition to Motion,
Att: 3 2 pgs Certification of Kimberly Biglow
Friday, May 03, 2024
notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice counsel added Fri 05/03 9:03 AM
Pro Hac Vice counsel, NATHAN B. ZION, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (jdg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF Thu 05/02 4:21 PM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Nathan B. Zion to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 250 receipt number ANJDC-15338246.) (LAMONT, PETER)
Related: [-]
10 10 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 05/02 1:14 PM
ORDER granting8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Nathan B. Zion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 5/2/2024. (jal, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
9 9 2 pgs misc Exhibit (to Document) Wed 05/01 5:25 PM
Exhibit to8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by JEFFREY ARDO, EN GARDE DEER DEFENSE, LLC. (LAMONT, PETER)
Related: [-]
8 8 3 pgs motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 05/01 2:22 PM
First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by JEFFREY ARDO, EN GARDE DEER DEFENSE, LLC.(LAMONT, PETER)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Decl. of Peter J. Lamont,
Att: 2 Declaration Decl. of Nathan B. Zion,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
qc QC - Document contains an Electronic Signature of a Non-Attorney Wed 05/01 4:46 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Declaration of Nathan B. Zion [8-2] submitted by PETER LAMONT on 5/1/24 contains an improper signature. Only Registered Users are permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DECLARATION ONLY WITH A SCANNED SIGNATURE USING *EXHIBIT (TO DOCUMENT)*. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (amv)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Wed 05/01 4:47 PM
Set Deadlines as to8 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 6/3/2024 before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (amv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
12 12 1 pgs minutes Status Conference Fri 05/03 12:27 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael A. Shipp: Telephone Conference held on 4/30/2024. (Court Reporter: Shannan Gagliardi (609-815-2750)) (jdb)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/30 11:35 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by PETER J. LAMONT on behalf of All Defendants (LAMONT, PETER)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
6 6 1 pgs service Summons Returned Executed Mon 04/29 11:45 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by NEW JERSEY DEER CONTROL, LLC. EN GARDE DEER DEFENSE, LLC served on 4/27/2024, answer due 5/20/2024. (MARINO, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs service Summons Returned Executed Mon 04/29 11:44 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by NEW JERSEY DEER CONTROL, LLC. JEFFREY ARDO served on 4/27/2024, answer due 5/20/2024. (MARINO, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
4 4 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 04/26 6:02 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order ("TRO") (ECF No.2 ). This matter is scheduled for a telephone conference on Tuesday, April 30, 2024, at 11:00 a.m. All parties shall attend. Because Defendants En Garde Deer Defense and Jeffrey Ardo ("Defendants") have not entered an appearance in this matter, Plaintiff must properly serve this Text Order on Defendants and file proof of service by Monday, April 29, 2024, at 2:00 pm. Please use the following dial-in information to connect to the conference: 1-888-684-8852; when prompted, use Access Code 4463781#. So Ordered by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 4/26/2024. (jdb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
3 3 2 pgs service Summons Issued Thu 04/25 8:51 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to JEFFREY ARDO, EN GARDE DEER DEFENSE, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (kht)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
2 2 5 pgs motion Temporary Restraining Order Wed 04/24 3:58 PM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by NEW JERSEY DEER CONTROL, LLC.(MARINO, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief in Support of Application for Injunctive Relief,
Att: 2 Certification of Christopher J. Marino
1 1 47 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 04/24 3:50 PM
COMPLAINT against JEFFREY ARDO, EN GARDE DEER DEFENSE, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15313976), filed by NEW JERSEY DEER CONTROL, LLC.(MARINO, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 04/25 8:49 AM
Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh added. (kht)
Related: [-]