Reynard v. Seaworld Entertainment, Inc. et al
California Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Thomas J Whelan |
Referred: | Barbara Lynn Major |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00742 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1446pi Notice of Removal- Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Apr 24, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Superior Court of California, County of San Diego, 37-02024-00009371-CU-PO-CTL |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 24, 2024 2:11 PM PDT |
Defendant
Does 1-50
|
|
Defendant
Seaworld Entertainment, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeanine Reynard
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
8
pgs
order
Order for Early Neutral Evaluation
Thu 04/25 11:46 AM
NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference: Early Neutral Evaluation set for 6/3/2024 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. Case Management Conference set for 6/3/2024 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. Joint Discovery Plan due 5/24/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 4/24/24.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(exs) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
respoth
Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)
Wed 04/24 2:23 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Seaworld Entertainment, Inc.. (axc1) (axc1) |
|
Att: 1 (4/24/2024) Info Sheet Answer | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Wed 04/24 1:28 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACASDC-18788360.), filed by Seaworld Entertainment, Inc.. The new case number is 3:24-cv-742-W-BLM. Judge Thomas J. Whelan and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case.(axc1) (Main Document 1 replaced on 4/24/2024) (axc1). (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/24/2024) (axc1) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 |