Johnson v. Hill et al
California Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Cathy Ann Bencivengo |
Referred: | Michelle M Pettit |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00743 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Apr 24, 2024 |
Petitioner
Thomas Johnson
|
|
Respondent
James Hill
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, May 02, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order of Judge Transfer
Thu 05/02 3:56 PM
MINUTE ORDER OF TRANSFER. Judge Marilyn L. Huff is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo for all further proceedings. The new case number is 23-cv-0743-CAB-MMP.(no document attached) (mjw) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
3
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 04/25 9:39 AM
Order Requiring Response to Petition (28 U.S.C. § 2254). Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit on 04/24/2024.(A copy of the Petition and a copy of this Order on the Attorney General for the State of California served via U.S. Mail Service)(mjw) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Wed 04/24 2:09 PM
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus against James Hill, R.J. Donovan Correctional Facility ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number ACASDC-18788302.), filed by Thomas Johnson. The new case number is 3:24-cv-743-H-MMP. Judge Marilyn L. Huff and Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit are assigned to the case. (Ford, Patrick)(alns) |
|
Att: 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |