Than v. Opportunity Financial, LLC et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Fred W Slaughter |
Referred: | Margo A Rocconi |
Case #: | 8:24-cv-00888 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 24, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Orange County Superior Court, 30-02024-01386572 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 24, 2024 2:12 PM PDT |
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Opportunity Financial, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Veasna Than
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Fri 04/26 3:28 PM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (mku) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Thu 04/25 11:38 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh) |
|
7 | 7
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Thu 04/25 11:37 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Thu 04/25 11:37 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fred W. Slaughter and Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (sh) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Settlement
Thu 04/25 10:03 AM
NOTICE of Settlement of Entire Case filed by Plaintiff Veasna Than. (Apps, Stanley) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1))
Thu 04/25 9:58 AM
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Veasna Than pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Opportunity Financial, LLC. (Apps, Stanley) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 04/24 1:32 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by Defendant Opportunity Financial, LLC (Frampton, Zachary) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Wed 04/24 1:30 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Opportunity Financial, LLC. (Frampton, Zachary) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 04/24 1:27 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2024 01386572-CL-MC-CJC Receipt No: ACACDC-37348067 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant Opportunity Financial, LLC. (Attorney Zachary C. Frampton added to party Opportunity Financial, LLC(pty:dft))(Frampton, Zachary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Thu 04/25 11:34 AM
CONFORMED EFILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Opportunity Financial, LLC. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Veasna Than.[FILED IN STATE COURT 3/15/2024 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 1 EXHIBIT 1 TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ] (sh) |