Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Cecilia M Altonaga
Case #: 1:24-cv-21572
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12182 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Apr 24, 2024
Terminated:May 22, 2024
Last checked: Monday Oct 21, 2024 4:28 AM EDT
Defendant
Caviar Russe Miami, LLC.,
Plaintiff
James Watson
Represented By
Juan Courtney Cunningham
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, June 27, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - aty Thu 06/27 3:35 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice by James Watson (Cunningham, Juan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
7 7 order Administrative Order Wed 05/22 3:02 PM
Administrative Order Closing Case. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 5/22/2024. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Settlement - aty Wed 05/22 1:11 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by James Watson (Cunningham, Juan)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
5 5 1 pgs order Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Fri 05/17 12:50 PM
ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties due by 6/14/2024. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 5/16/2024. See attached document for full details. (wc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
4 4 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Wed 05/15 6:18 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by James Watson. Caviar Russe Miami, LLC., served on 5/14/2024, response/answer due 6/4/2024. (Cunningham, Juan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 04/25 9:04 AM
Summons Issued as to Caviar Russe Miami, LLC.,. (kpe)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Thu 04/25 9:02 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (kpe)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 04/24 4:41 PM
COMPLAINT against Caviar Russe Miami, LLC.,. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17475969, filed by James Watson.(Cunningham, Juan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s)