Texas Western District Court
Judge:Alia Moses
Referred: Joseph A Cordova
Case #: 2:24-cv-00038
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Apr 24, 2024
Last checked: Monday Oct 21, 2024 3:51 AM CDT
Defendant
Maria Torralba Muzquiz
Represented By
Raul De La Garza
Roerig, Oliveira & Fisher, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Ashley Gonzalez Hernandez
Plaintiff
Jose Mijarez Ibanez
Represented By
Charles Anthony Shattles
Watkins & Shattles, P.L.L.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 84 minutes ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
order Order on Motion to Continue Mon 04/28 12:47 PM
Text Order DENYING25 Motion to Continue entered by Judge Joseph A Cordova. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
25 25 motion Continue Wed 04/16 4:25 PM
Agreed MOTION to Continue by Jose Mijarez Ibanez.. Motions referred to Judge Joseph A Cordova. (Shattles, Charles)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
24 24 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 04/15 9:55 AM
ORDER, Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 5/13/2025 09:30 AM before Judge Joseph A Cordova. Signed by Judge Joseph A Cordova. (ccr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
23 23 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 01/10 3:03 PM
ORDER GRANTING21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Victor V. Vicinaiz for Maria Torralba Muzquiz. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center Signed by Chief Judge Alia Moses. (ccr)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
22 22 trial Witness/Exhibit/Expert List Fri 11/22 2:04 PM
WITNESS/EXHIBIT/EXPERT LIST by Jose Mijarez Ibanez Plaintiff's Disclosure of Testifying Experts . (Shattles, Charles)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
20 20 misc Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid Thu 10/17 11:21 AM
Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 2219. (ccr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
21 21 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 10/17 11:25 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 2219) by Maria Torralba Muzquiz.. Motions referred to Judge Joseph A Cordova. (ccr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
19 19 order Scheduling Order Fri 08/23 9:01 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: ADR Report Deadline due by 2/21/2025, Amended Pleadings due by 12/23/2024, Discovery due by 2/21/2025, Motions due by 2/21/2025,. Signed by Judge Joseph A Cordova. (ic)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
18 18 misc Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order Tue 06/25 2:39 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order Joint by Maria Torralba Muzquiz. (De La Garza, Raul)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan Tue 06/25 2:33 PM
Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan by Maria Torralba Muzquiz. (De La Garza, Raul)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
16 16 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 06/13 2:59 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Anthony Shattles on behalf of Jose Mijarez Ibanez. Attorney Charles Anthony Shattles added to party Jose Mijarez Ibanez(pty:pla) (Shattles, Charles)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
15 15 1 pgs order Order Tue 06/04 4:04 PM
ORDER FOR REPORT AND SCHEDULING PROPOSALS, it is hereby ORDERED that, no later than JULY 1, 2024, the parties shall confer as provided in Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) and submit the following: (1) a joint report that conforms to Appendix N of the Local Civil Rules; and (2) a joint proposed scheduling order that conforms to Appendix B of the Local Civil Rules. Signed by Judge Joseph A Cordova. (ao)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Notice of Right to Consent to Magistrate Trial Tue 06/04 3:51 PM
NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGES AVAILABILITY. Signed by Judge Joseph A Cordova. (ao)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Magistrate Judge Wed 06/26 5:09 PM
CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Joseph A Cordova. (jaw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
13 13 misc Redacted Copy Thu 05/16 1:45 PM
Redacted Copy Corrected of1 Notice of Removal by Maria Torralba Muzquiz.(De La Garza, Raul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D
12 12 notice Deficiency Notice Thu 05/16 10:09 AM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re 11 Redacted Copy (am3)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
11 11 misc Redacted Copy Wed 05/15 4:30 PM
Redacted Copy of1 Notice of Removal by Maria Torralba Muzquiz.(De La Garza, Raul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D
Monday, May 06, 2024
10 10 misc Certified Mail Receipt Mon 05/06 2:16 PM
Return Certified Mail Receipt of9 Certified Mail Receipt (ao)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
9 9 misc Certified Mail Receipt Wed 05/01 10:57 AM
Certified Mail Receipt of8 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (jaw)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
8 8 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/30 11:04 AM
ORDER GRANTING6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center Signed by Chief Judge Alia Moses. (jaw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
7 7 misc Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid Wed 04/24 4:18 PM
Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 1731. (jaw)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/24 4:15 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 1731) by Maria Torralba Muzquiz. (jaw)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice Wed 04/24 4:11 PM
NOTICE: List of Counsel of Record by Maria Torralba Muzquiz (jaw)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) Submitted Wed 04/24 4:05 PM
Supplement to JS44 Civil Cover Sheet submitted by Maria Torralba Muzquiz. (jaw)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Filing Fee Received Wed 04/24 4:00 PM
Filing fee received in the amount of $405, receipt number 1732 (jaw)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) Submitted Wed 04/24 3:59 PM
JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) submitted by Maria Torralba Muzquiz. (jaw)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Wed 04/24 3:44 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL Related [+], filed by Maria Torralba Muzquiz. (jaw)
Related: [-] ceipt number 1732, Filing fee $405
Att: 1 Exhibit;
Att: 2 Exhibit Index of Matters Filed