Vining v. Maynard
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | Scott T Varholak |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01143 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Apr 24, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Denver County District Court, 2023CV33774 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 24, 2024 5:10 PM MDT |
Defendant
Mujaahid Maynard
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Koren Vining
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 05/01 10:32 AM
ANSWER to3 Complaint and Jury Demand by Mujaahid Maynard.(Volker, Luke) |
|
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
order
Minute Order
Tue 04/30 4:11 PM
MINUTE ORDER This matter is before the Court pursuant to conversation between Chambers and the parties. The Scheduling Conference set for 6/6/2024 is VACATED and RESET for 6/17/2024 02:00 PM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Proposed Scheduling Order due 6/10/2024. Consent/Non-Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form due on or before 6/3/2024. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 4/30/2024. Text Only Entry (stvlc4, ) |
|
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 04/29 11:19 AM
ORDER Setting Deadline for Filing Election Concerning Consent/Non-Consent to Magistrate Jurisdiction Form and Setting Scheduling Conference by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 4/29/2024. Consent Form due by 5/23/2024 . Proposed Scheduling Order due 5/30/2024 . Scheduling Conference set for 6/6/2024 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. (ccuen, ) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Entry of Appearance
Thu 04/25 3:52 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Counsel by Luke James Volker on behalf of Mujaahid MaynardAttorney Luke James Volker added to party Mujaahid Maynard(pty:dft) (Volker, Luke) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Magistrate Judge Consent Form
Thu 04/25 12:11 PM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (efoga, ) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Case Assigned to Judge
Thu 04/25 12:11 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry (efoga, ) |
|
4 | 4
service
Affidavit/Return of Service - Other than Complaint
Thu 04/25 12:09 PM
AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Summons, and Civil Complaint and Jury Demand upon Mujaahid Maynard on 3/25/2024 (efoga, ) |
|
3 | 3
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/25 12:04 PM
CIVIL COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Mujaahid Maynard, filed by Koren Vining.(efoga, ) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Notice to Attorney(s) in Removed, Transferred or Other Cases
Thu 04/25 11:57 AM
FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (efoga, ) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Wed 04/24 2:44 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Mujaahid Maynard from Denver County District Court, Case Number 2023CV33774. (Filing fee $ 405, Receipt Number ACODC-9654140), filed by Mujaahid Maynard.(Dagner, Deana) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A-State Court Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B-Defendant Domicile Sworn Statement, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C-Affidavit of Service Maynard, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D-State Court Civil Case Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E-State Court Delay Reduction Order, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit F-State Court Pre Trial Order, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit G-State Court Forthwith Motion EOT Serve Maynard, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit H-State Court Proposed Order EOT Serve Maynard, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit I-State Court Order Grant Motion EOT Serve Maynard, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit J-Returned Mail Undeliverable, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit K-State Court Second Motion EOT Serve Maynard, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit L-State Court Proposed Order Grant 2nd Motion EOT Serve Maynard, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit M-Order Grant 2nd Motion EOT Serve Maynard, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit N-Returned Mail Undeliverable |