Higuera v. The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
California Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Michael M Anello |
Referred: | Karen S Crawford |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00744 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.: Civil Enforcement of Employee Benefits |
Case Filed: | Apr 24, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 24, 2024 5:11 PM PDT |
Defendant
The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
|
|
Plaintiff
Jose Higuera
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
2
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Thu 04/25 11:42 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE : Plaintiff to Show Cause in writing by 5/3/2024. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 4/25/24.(aas) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Wed 04/24 3:25 PM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (axc1) |
|
1 | 1
3
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/24 3:21 PM
COMPLAINT against The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACASDC-18788727.), filed by Jose Higuera. The new case number is 3:24-cv-744-MMA-KSC. Judge Michael M. Anello and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case. (Bonnici, Joshua)(axc1) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |