VRC2735, LLC
Pennsylvania Middle Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Case #: | 5:24-bk-01019 |
Case Filed: | Apr 24, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $500,001 to $1 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Single Asset Real Estate |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
VRC2735, LLC
6272 Route 191
Cresco, PA 18326 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Asst. U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
US Courthouse 1501 N. 6th St
Harrisburg, PA 17102 |
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 6:07 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
3
pgs
motion
Employ (do NOT use to Employ/Appoint an Examiner, Ombudsman, Trustee)
Tue 04/30 5:27 PM
Application to Employ J. Zac Christman, Esquire as Attorney. Filed by J. Zac Christman of J. Zac Christman, Esquire on behalf of VRC2735, LLC. (Christman, J.) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Disinterestedness | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service | ||
Att: 4 Certificate of Service Mailing | ||
Att: 5 Certificate of Service Mailing Matrix | ||
4 | 4
misc
Appearance (Entry and/or Withdrawal)
Tue 04/30 8:14 AM
Entry of Appearance of Gregory B. Schiller Filed by Gregory Benjamin Schiller of US Department of Justice on behalf of United States Trustee. (Schiller, Gregory) |
|
Saturday, April 27, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
court
BNC Certificate of Notice (Ch 11 document sent to the Securities and Exchange Commission)
Sun 04/28 12:23 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice (Ch 11 document sent to the Securities and Exchange Commission) . Notice Date 04/27/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Creditor List Uploaded (docket event previously named Matrix Filed)
Wed 04/24 10:44 PM
Creditor List Uploaded. (There is no image or paper document associated with this entry.) Filed by J. Zac Christman of J. Zac Christman, Esquire on behalf of VRC2735, LLC . (Christman, J.) |
|
1 | 1
36
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Wed 04/24 10:40 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for a Non-Individual . Filing fee due in the amount of $1738.00. Filed by J. Zac Christman of J. Zac Christman, Esquire on behalf of VRC2735, LLC. (Christman, J.) |
|
crditcrd
Auto-docket of credit card
Wed 04/24 10:42 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:5:24-bk-01019] ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) filing fee. Receipt number A11041252, amount $ 1738.00. . (U.S. Treasury) |