Haynes, Marquise v. Dade Correctional Institution
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Roy K Altman |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-21551 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 State Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 23, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 24, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
5
pgs
order
Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party
Wed 04/24 4:41 PM
ORDER. The Complaint [ECF No.1 ] is DISMISSED for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. See 28 U.S.C. § 1915A(b). All pending motions are DENIED as moot. The Clerk of Court shall CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 4/24/2024. See attached document for full details. (nan) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
order
Judge Assignment
Wed 04/24 11:49 AM
Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman (kma) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens
Wed 04/24 11:44 AM
Complaint pursuant to 42 USC 1983 against Dade Correctional Institution. Filing fee $ 405.00 (Filing fee not paid/ IFP Motion not filed), filed by Marquise Haynes.(kma) |
|
Att: 1 Grievances |