Doe v. Wellstar Health System, Inc.
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | J P Boulee |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01748 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Apr 23, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 25, 2024 12:44 AM EDT |
Defendant
Wellstar Health System, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Jane Doe
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
misc
Approval of Application for Admission PHV
Fri 04/26 4:33 PM
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:8 APPLICATION for Admission of Brandon M. Wise Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13391337). Attorney Brandon Michael Wise added appearing on behalf of Jane Doe. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (djs) |
||
order
Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Fri 04/26 4:53 PM
ORDER granting8 Application for Admission of Brandon M. Wise Pro Hac Vice. So ordered by Judge J. P. Boulee on April 26, 2024. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jkl) |
||
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Thu 04/25 3:59 PM
APPLICATION for Admission of Brandon M. Wise Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13391337).by Jane Doe. (Tate, Andrew) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Letter re:83.1
Wed 04/24 10:11 AM
Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Brandon Michael Wise. Clerk to follow-up by 5/6/2024. (cpp) |
|
6 | 6
30+
pgs
order
Order
Wed 04/24 9:21 AM
STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on April 24, 2024. (jkl) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Letter re:83.1
Wed 04/24 9:15 AM
Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Britany Kabakov. Clerk to follow-up by 5/6/2024. (cpp) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Letter re:83.1
Wed 04/24 9:12 AM
Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Elena Belov. Clerk to follow-up by 5/6/2024. (cpp) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Letter re:83.1
Wed 04/24 9:09 AM
Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to David S. Almeida. Clerk to follow-up by 5/6/2024. (cpp) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Wed 04/24 8:58 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Wellstar Health System, Inc. (pdt) |
|
1 | 1
124
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/24 8:56 AM
CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Jane Doe. (Filing fee $405, receipt number AGANDC-13383105) (pdt) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |