Estrada v. RTG Furniture Corp. of Georgia
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Sarah E Geraghty |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01749 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 et seq. Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990 |
Case Filed: | Apr 23, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 25, 2024 12:45 AM EDT |
Defendant
RTG Furniture Corp. of Georgia
|
|
Plaintiff
Michael Estrada
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
30+
pgs
order
Order
Fri 04/26 3:51 PM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 4/26/2024. (sap) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Thu 04/25 10:30 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to RTG Furniture Corp. of Georgia. (ane) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Filing
Wed 04/24 1:20 PM
NOTICE Of Filing Corrected Summons by Michael Estrada re1 Complaint, (Pope, Matthew) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/24 12:44 PM
COMPLAINT (Filing fee $405, receipt number AGANDC-13383199) filed by Michael Estrada.(ajw) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |