Gray v. Danforth
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Michael L Brown |
Referred: | Justin S Anand |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01751 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Apr 22, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 25, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
utility
Clerks Certificate of Mailing
Fri 04/26 8:09 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Ronald B. Gray re2 Order. (kng) |
||
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 04/26 7:40 AM
ORDER DIRECTING the Clerk to ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 4/25/2024. (kng) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Fri 04/26 8:09 AM
Civil Case Terminated. Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand terminated from case. (kng) |
||
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
utility
Submission to Magistrate Judge
Wed 04/24 12:36 PM
Submission of1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus for IFP and frivolity determination to Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. (kng) |
||
utility
Docket Correction
Wed 04/24 2:04 PM
Notification of Docket Correction re1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Modified to correct file dates. (kng) |
||
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Wed 04/24 12:32 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Ronald B. Gray.(kng) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (kng). Modified to correct file date on 4/24/2024 (kng) |
|
Att: 1 (4/24/2024) Order |