McKibben v. Murphy Oil USA, Inc. et al
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Steve C Jones |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01754 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1446 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Apr 23, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 25, 2024 12:45 AM EDT |
Defendant
John Doe
|
|
Defendant
Murphy Oil USA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Meyosha McKibben
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 05/01 12:59 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Murphy Oil USA, Inc.. |
|
3 | 3
answer
Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)
Wed 05/01 12:58 PM
ANSWER to1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Murphy Oil USA, Inc.. Discovery ends on 9/30/2024 |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
3
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Thu 04/25 4:36 PM
SHOW CAUSE ORDER directing Defendant Murphy Oil USA, Inc. to file within 14 DAYS of the entry of this Order a supplemental statement of facts regarding Plaintiff's citizenship or otherwise SHOW CAUSE why this action should not be remanded for failure of proof of subject-matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 04/25/2024. (ddm) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Wed 04/24 9:01 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AGANDC-13385238) filed by Murphy Oil USA, Inc..(gww) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Summons to Murphy Oil USA, Inc., | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Errata 3 - Affidavit of Service to Murphy Oil USA, Inc, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet |