SICIS, s.r.l. v. Shinex Mosaics Global et al
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Thomas W Thrash, Jr |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01772 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 28:1338 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Apr 24, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 25, 2024 12:49 AM EDT |
Defendant
Inex Industries, LTD.
|
|
Defendant
John Does 1-5
|
|
Defendant
Sachin Palsokar
|
|
Defendant
Shinex Mosaics Global
|
|
Defendant
Shinex Mosaics USA
|
|
Plaintiff
SICIS, s.r.l.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, May 02, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
order
Preliminary Injunction ~Util - Terminate Motions
Thu 05/02 9:56 AM
STIPULATED PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 5/2/2024. (jkb) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Preliminary Injunction
Thu 05/02 9:25 AM
Consent MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by SICIS, s.r.l.. (Curry, Joshua) |
|
notice
Notice of Cancellation of Hearing
Thu 05/02 10:02 AM
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION of Hearing re: NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re:12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED . The Motion Hearing set for 5/3/2024 at 10:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 2108 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr has been canceled in light of the parties' agreement to the stipulated preliminary injunction. (cbi) |
||
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/29 4:00 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Roy A. Banerjee on behalf of Shinex Mosaics Global (Banerjee, Roy) |
|
notice
Notice of Hearing on Motion
Mon 04/29 2:20 PM
NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re:12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED . Motion Hearing set for 5/3/2024 at 10:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 2108 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. (cbi) |
||
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Temporary Restraining Order
Fri 04/26 6:55 PM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED with Brief In Support by SICIS, s.r.l..(Curry, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1 Brief Brief ISO Motion for TRO, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
11 | 11
service
Return of Service Executed
Fri 04/26 6:40 PM
Return of Service Executed by SICIS, s.r.l.. Shinex Mosaics USA served on 4/25/2024, answer due 5/16/2024. (Curry, Joshua) |
|
10 | 10
service
Return of Service Executed
Fri 04/26 6:40 PM
Return of Service Executed by SICIS, s.r.l.. Shinex Mosaics Global served on 4/25/2024, answer due 5/16/2024. (Curry, Joshua) |
|
9 | 9
service
Return of Service Executed
Fri 04/26 6:38 PM
Return of Service Executed by SICIS, s.r.l.. Sachin Palsokar served on 4/25/2024, answer due 5/16/2024. (Curry, Joshua) |
|
8 | 8
service
Return of Service Executed
Fri 04/26 6:37 PM
Return of Service Executed by SICIS, s.r.l.. Inex Industries, LTD. served on 4/25/2024, answer due 5/16/2024. (Curry, Joshua) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
misc
Clerk's Notation for LOA/CIP
Thu 04/25 2:38 PM
Clerk's Notation re3 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Reviewed and approved by TWT. (cbi) |
||
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Wed 04/24 4:11 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Inex Industries, LTD. (jkb) |
|
6 | 6
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Wed 04/24 4:11 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Shinex Mosaics Global. (jkb) |
|
5 | 5
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Wed 04/24 4:10 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Shinex Mosaics USA. (jkb) |
|
4 | 4
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Wed 04/24 3:30 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Sachin Palsokar. (jkb) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 04/24 3:24 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by SICIS, s.r.l. identifying Corporate Parent Prestige SpA, Other Affiliate Maurizio Placuzzi for SICIS, s.r.l.. (jkb) |
|
2 | 2
misc
A.O. Form 121 Copyright
Wed 04/24 3:20 PM
AO Form 121 forwarded to Registrar. (jkb) |
|
1 | 1
32
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/24 3:17 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand and with request for injunction filed by SICIS, s.r.l. (Filing fee $405, receipt number AGANDC-13387315)(jkb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 4/24/2024 (jkb). |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Submission to District Judge
Wed 04/24 3:28 PM
Submission of1 Complaint with request for injunction, to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. (jkb) Modified on 4/24/2024 (jkb) |
||
Submission of1 Complaint with request for injunction, to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. (jkb) Modified on 4/24/2024 (jkb). |