Maryland District Court
Judge:A David Copperthite
Case #: 1:24-cv-01155
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1330 Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2024
Terminated:Apr 26, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Oct 19, 2024 5:25 AM EDT
Defendant
BayVanguard Bank
7114 NORTH POINT RD
Baltimore, MD 21219
Defendant
Idlewild Properties, LLC
304 High Street
Cambridge, MD 21613
Plaintiff
Democracy Capital Corp.
4800 Montgomery Lane
Bethesda, MD 20814
Represented By
Donald A Rea
The Law Offices Of Donald A. Rea LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, April 26, 2024
7 7 1 pgs order Order Fri 04/26 1:15 PM
MARGINAL ORDER approving6 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Democracy Capital Corp. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 4/26/2024. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 04/26 10:51 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Democracy Capital Corp. Related [+]
Related: [-] a, Donald
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
5 5 order 25 Pct Mag - Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Order Wed 04/24 11:46 AM
Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 4/24/2024. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite. Plaintiff Democracy Capital Corp. or counsel for Democracy Capital Corp. are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Procedures which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded[LINK:here] , counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 5/8/2024. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 04/24 11:29 AM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite. Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi no longer assigned to the case. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
3 3 QC NOTICES re:1 Complaint filed by Democracy Capital Corp. and2 Complaint, filed by Democracy Capital Corp. **(1) Civil Cover Sheet filed as 1 Complaint is blank. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (2) A completed Civil Cover Sheet and Summons were not attached to 2 Complaint. Please file a completed Civil Cover Sheet and completed Summons using the event "notice(other)", and link them to 2 Complaint. (3) A duplicate filing fee payment was made at ECF no. 2 due to using the Complaint event twice. Please reach out to this Court's Finance Department for Refund. This notice will also be generated to the Finance Department as a courtesy. Thank you. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (c/nef to finance 4/23/24)
Related: [-]
2 2 COMPLAINT Democracy Capital Corp. against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMDDC-11220077.), filed by Democracy Capital Corp.. Related [+]
Related: [-] a, Donald
Att: 1 Exhibit Participation Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit MDSW Correspondence,
Att: 3 Exhibit Idlewild Art. Org.
1 1 (FILED IN ERROR- Blank Civil Cover Sheet only attached) COMPLAINT Democracy Capital Corp. against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMDDC-11220054.), filed by Democracy Capital Corp Related [+] Modified on 4/23/2024 (dass, Deputy Clerk).
Related: [-] a, Donald