Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Kelley Brisbon Hodge
Case #: 2:24-cv-01711
Nature of Suit320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Jan 09, 2025 11:26 AM EST
Defendant
CHRISTOPHER BRYAN LEONARD
Represented By
JENNIFER L. PRIOR
Kaufman Dolowich
contact info
GREGORY S. HYMAN
Kaufman Dolowich & Voluck LLP
contact info
Defendant
IMS TECHNOLOGY SERVICES, INC.
Represented By
ALEXANDER NEMIROFF
Gordon & Rees, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
MICHAEL LAWRENCE LOMBARDO
45 LAUREL TRAIL
MONROE, NY 10950

GPO Mar 25 2025
MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KELLEY BRISBON HODGE ON 3/25/25. 3/25/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
GPO Mar 25 2025
Order that Count IV and Article VII (Plaintiffs request for permanent injunction) are DISMISSEDWITH PREJUDICE, pursuant to Plaintiffs consent to dismissal.2. Defendant IMSs Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court shall mark IMS TERMINATED from the case. 3. Defendant Leonards Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART.a. The Motion to Dismiss Counts I and II is DENIED.b. Counts III and V are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE.c. Count VI is DISMISSED; Plaintiff is granted leave to amend this claim within 14days of this Order. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KELLEY BRISBON HODGE ON 3/25/25. 3/25/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
37 37 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 04/28 11:59 AM
ORDER THAT RULE 16 CONFERENCE SET FOR 6/11/2025 10:00 AM IN Video Conference. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KELLEY BRISBON HODGE ON 4/28/25. 4/28/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
36 36 15 pgs answer Answer to Amended Complaint Wed 04/23 10:41 AM
Defendant's ANSWER to35 Amended Complaint by CHRISTOPHER BRYAN LEONARD.(HYMAN, GREGORY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Certificate of Service
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
35 35 22 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Wed 04/09 1:54 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint against CHRISTOPHER BRYAN LEONARD, filed by MICHAEL LAWRENCE LOMBARDO.(Pierce, Alan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
34 34 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Wed 04/02 3:18 PM
ORDER granting33 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE OF ALAN J. PIERCE. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KELLEY BRISBON HODGE ON 4/1/25.4/2/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
33 33 9 pgs motion Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Tue 04/01 10:18 AM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-18184209.) filed by MICHAEL LAWRENCE LOMBARDO.Certificate of Service.(LEHMAN, JACOB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
32 32 1 pgs order Memorandum and/or Opinion Order Tue 03/25 12:52 PM
Order that Count IV and Article VII (Plaintiffs request for permanent injunction) are DISMISSEDWITH PREJUDICE, pursuant to Plaintiffs consent to dismissal.2. Defendant IMSs Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court shall mark IMS TERMINATED from the case. 3. Defendant Leonards Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART.a. The Motion to Dismiss Counts I and II is DENIED.b. Counts III and V are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE.c. Count VI is DISMISSED; Plaintiff is granted leave to amend this claim within 14days of this Order. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KELLEY BRISBON HODGE ON 3/25/25. 3/25/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
31 31 20 pgs order Memorandum and/or Opinion Tue 03/25 12:50 PM
MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KELLEY BRISBON HODGE ON 3/25/25. 3/25/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
30 30 1 pgs misc Letter Thu 03/13 5:42 PM
Letter dated 3/13/2025 by MICHAEL LAWRENCE LOMBARDO. (LEHMAN, JACOB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
29 29 1 pgs order Order Thu 03/06 3:38 PM
ORDER THAT ON OR BEFORE 3/13/25 PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE A RESPONSE STATING HIS POSITION ON THE ISSUE ADDRESSED BY DEFENDANT. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KELLEY BRISBON HODGE ON 3/6/25. 3/6/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
28 28 2 pgs misc Letter Wed 03/05 9:48 AM
Letter dated March 5, 2025 by IMS TECHNOLOGY SERVICES, INC.. (Hiester, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
27 27 1 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Mon 02/24 4:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JACOB C. LEHMAN on behalf of MICHAEL LAWRENCE LOMBARDO (LEHMAN, JACOB)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
26 26 minutes Status Conference 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Fri 02/21 12:25 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE KELLEY BRISBON HODGE Status Conference held on 2/12/25. (rf, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
25 25 1 pgs order Order Thu 02/13 10:41 AM
ORDER THAT ON OR BEFORE 2/24/25, PLAINTIFF MICHAEL LOMBARDO WILL PROVIDE THE COURT WITH A COPY OF HIS LEGAL ADVISOR RETAINER FROM ATTORNEY ALAN PIERCE; PROVIDE THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL WITH A DESCRIPTION OF WHICH PORTIONS OF THE SUBMITTED FILINGS WERE DRAFTED BY PRO SE PLAINTIFF LOMBARDO AND WHICH WERE DRAFTED BY OR WITH THE ASSISTANCE OF AN ATTORNEY AND IDENTIFY THE EXTENT OF THE ASSISTANCE; AND INFORM THE COURT WHETHER HE PLANS TO CONTINUE THIS CASE PRO SE OR IF HE PLANS TO RETAIN COUNSEL TO REPRESENT HIM. IF COUNSEL IS RETAINED, THEY MUST MAKE THEIR ENTRY OF APPEARANCE BY FEBRUARY 24, 2025; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KELLEY BRISBON HODGE ON 2/13/25. 2/13/25 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
24 24 2 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/07 3:56 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by David Hiester on behalf of IMS TECHNOLOGY SERVICES, INC. with Certificate of Service(Hiester, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
23 23 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 02/06 1:16 PM
ORDER THAT STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 2/13/2025 03:00 PM IN Telephone Conference. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KELLEY BRISBON HODGE ON 2/6/25. 2/6/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
22 22 11 pgs respm Response in Support of Motion Mon 07/29 3:22 PM
RESPONSE in Support re17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by IMS TECHNOLOGY SERVICES, INC.. (NEMIROFF, ALEXANDER)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
21 21 8 pgs respm Response in Support of Motion Fri 07/26 2:49 PM
RESPONSE in Support re14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Amended Complaint Reply Brief in Support of His Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Amended Complaint filed by CHRISTOPHER BRYAN LEONARD. (HYMAN, GREGORY)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
20 20 19 pgs respoth Response Mon 07/22 1:56 PM
BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DIMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT by MICHAEL LAWRENCE LOMBARDO. (er)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs COVER PAGE
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
19 19 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 07/09 9:37 AM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS TIME TO PLEAD TO THE DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS IS EXTENDED TO 7/22/24. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KELLEY BRISBON HODGE ON 7/9/24. 7/9/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
18 18 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 07/03 2:08 PM
ORDER denying as moot11 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KELLEY BRISBON HODGE ON 7/2/24.7/3/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
17 17 2 pgs motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 06/24 4:19 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by IMS TECHNOLOGY SERVICES, INC..Memorandum.(NEMIROFF, ALEXANDER)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 18 pgs Memorandum
Friday, June 21, 2024
16 16 2 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Fri 06/21 10:36 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by JENNIFER L. PRIOR on behalf of CHRISTOPHER BRYAN LEONARD with Certificate of Service(PRIOR, JENNIFER)
Related: [-]
15 15 3 pgs trial Exhibit Fri 06/21 10:33 AM
EXHIBIT A to Leonard's MTD Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by CHRISTOPHER BRYAN LEONARD.. (HYMAN, GREGORY)
Related: [-]
14 14 1 pgs motion Dismiss Fri 06/21 10:17 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Amended Complaint filed by CHRISTOPHER BRYAN LEONARD.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(HYMAN, GREGORY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 16 pgs Memorandum
Saturday, June 08, 2024
13 13 2 pgs respm Response to Motion Mon 06/10 9:10 AM
PLAINTFFS RESPONSE TO MOTION OF IMS TECHNOLOGY SERVICES INC. TO DISMSS PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(6) filed by MICHAEL LAWRENCE LOMBARDO.(mas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs cover sheet
12 12 17 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Mon 06/10 9:09 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against IMS TECHNOLOGY SERVICES, INC., CHRISTOPHER BRYAN LEONARD, filed by MICHAEL LAWRENCE LOMBARDO.(mas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 cover sheet
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
11 11 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 05/28 7:14 AM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by IMS TECHNOLOGY SERVICES, INC..Certificate of Service, Meet & Confer Certification.(NEMIROFF, ALEXANDER)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 4 pgs Memorandum,
Att: 2 1 pgs Text of Proposed Order
Friday, May 24, 2024
10 10 1 pgs order Order Fri 05/24 1:08 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT IS EXTENDED TO 6/11/24. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KELLEY BRISBON HODGE ON 5/24/24. 5/24/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
9 9 2 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Tue 05/21 3:41 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ALEXANDER NEMIROFF on behalf of IMS TECHNOLOGY SERVICES, INC. with Certificate of Service(NEMIROFF, ALEXANDER)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
8 8 service Affidavit of Service Mon 05/13 10:36 AM
PROOF of Service completed by Joseph Valentine in re: served summons upon IMS Technology Services by Personal service on 5/6/24.(mas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 cover sheet
7 7 service Affidavit of Service Mon 05/13 10:34 AM
PROOF of Service completed by Joseph Valentine in re: served summons upon Christopher Bryan Leonard by Personal service on 5/6/24.(mas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 cover sheet
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
misc Remark Tue 04/30 8:18 AM
MAILED OUT SUMMONS6 TO PLAINTIFF ON 4/30/24. (jaa, )
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
6 6 2 pgs service Summons Issued Mon 04/29 5:08 PM
Summons Issued as to IMS TECHNOLOGY SERVICES, INC., CHRISTOPHER BRYAN LEONARD. (rf, )
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Filing Fee Received Mon 04/29 5:03 PM
Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number 20019673 (rf, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
4 4 order Pro Se Civil Admin Order 5 Thu 04/25 1:27 PM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF HAVING FILE A COMPLAINT WITH THE COURT WITHOUT EITHER PAYING THE FEES TO COMMENCE A CIVIL ACTION OR FILING A MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, PLAINTIFF MUST, WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, EITHER PAY $405 TO THE CLERK OF COURT, OR FILE A MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. IF PLAINTIFF FAILS TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER, THE CASE MAY BE DISMISSED WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE.. SIGNED BY GEORGE V WYLESOL, CLERK OF COURT ON 4/25/24. 4/25/24 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED. *NON PRISONER IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION MAILED TO LOMBARDO*(rf, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
3 3 1 pgs trial Exhibit Thu 04/25 7:38 AM
CORRECTED DESIGNATION FORM by MICHAEL LAWRENCE LOMBARDO..(rf, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs COVER SHEET
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
2 2 notice Notice re: Pro Se Guidelines Wed 04/24 2:09 PM
PRO SE NOTICE RE: GUIDELINES (rf, )
Related: [-]
1 1 19 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 04/24 2:07 PM
COMPLAINT against IMS TECHNOLOGIES SERVICES, INC., CHRISTOPHER BRYAN LEONARD, filed by MICHAEL LAWRENCE LOMBARDO. *NO FEE PAID. NO IFP FILED*(rf, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 COVER SHEET