Whitetail Ridge Trust CTO et al v. Benge et al
Wisconsin Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | William C Griesbach |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00485 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Apr 23, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 25, 2024 12:22 AM CDT |
Defendant
John Joseph Benge
|
|
Defendant
Dr Keith Davis
|
|
Defendant
Patrick W Greenwood
|
|
Defendant
Elizabeth Marie Polsdofer
|
|
Defendant
Jim Reber
|
|
Defendant
Daniel Ray Rockhold
|
|
Defendant
Traci Thrap
|
|
Defendant
Alan Wilson
|
|
Involuntary Plaintiff
Heavens Door Trust CTO
|
|
Plaintiff
Whitetail Ridge Trust CTO
Dean Raymond Daul and Daniel Scott Peterson as Trustees and secured party creditors N5119 County Road AB
Luxemburg, WI 54217 |
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
2
pgs
order
Order
Wed 05/01 4:28 PM
ORDER Striking1 Complaint - Pro Se, filed by Whitetail Ridge Trust CTO signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 5/1/2024. Because Daul and Peterson are not licensed attorneys, they cannot represent Whitetail Ridge Trust. Accordingly, the pro se complaint1 is STRICKEN. To proceed with this action, Daul and Peterson must retain counsel to represent the Trust in this matter. Retained counsel must file a notice of appearance within thirty days of the date of this order. Within thirty days of the notice of appearance being filed by counsel, counsel shall file an amended complaint. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party) (Griesbach, William) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint - Pro Se
Wed 04/24 11:48 AM
PRO SE COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Whitetail Ridge Trust CTO. Consent forms distributed for Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin. (Filing Fee PAID; Receipt Number 6486) (Service Packet Issued) (jmk) |
|
Att: 1 Bookmarked Exhibits |