California Central District Court
Judge:Consuelo B Marshall
Referred: Stephanie S Christensen
Case #: 2:24-cv-03327
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2024
Terminated:Jul 02, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
4 4 order Dismissing Case Fri 07/05 11:22 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL OR REMAND by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. Accordingly, this case is HEREBY ORDERED DISMISSED without prejudice. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (rolm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
3 3 notice Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-25) - optional html form Wed 04/24 9:12 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and referred to Magistrate Judge Stephanie S. Christensen. (sh)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
2 2 notice Notice Re: Discrepancies in Filing of Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint (CV-93P) Wed 04/24 9:12 AM
Notice Re: Discrepancies in Filing of Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint (CV-93P). Upon submission of your civil rights complaint, it was noted that you did not pay the appropriate filing fee. If you are unable to pay the entire filing fee at this time, you must sign and complete the Request to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support form (CV-60P) attached. You may return your fee waiver and/or payment to any of the Courthouses listed on this notice. If you do not respond within THIRTY DAYS from the date below, your action may be dismissed. Re: Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights),1 (sh)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint - (Prisoner Civil Rights) Wed 04/24 9:11 AM
CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against Defendants CSP LAC, County of Los Angeles, E. Lake, Lancaster City, J. Moeckly, Religious Review Committee pursuant to 42:1983. Case assigned to Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and referred to Magistrate Judge Stephanie S. Christensen., filed by Plaintiff Marcus R. Ellington, Sr. (sh)
Related: [-]