California Central District Court
Judge:Jesus G Bernal
Case #: 2:24-cv-03344
Nature of Suit422 Bankruptcy - Appeal 28 USC 158
Cause28:0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BAP)
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2024

Debtor
Leslie Klein

,
Last checked: Sunday Oct 20, 2024 2:18 AM PDT
Appellant
Leslie Klein
Represented By
Eric J Olson
Ejolsonlaw
contact info
Appellee
David Berger
Represented By
Baruch C. Cohen
Law Offices Of Baruch Cohen Aplc
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Friday, September 20, 2024
20 20 misc Reply Fri 09/20 10:47 AM
REPLY filed by Appellee David Berger to Response19 (Cohen, Baruch)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
19 19 misc Response Thu 09/19 3:28 PM
RESPONSE filed by In re Debtor Leslie Klein, Appellant Leslie Kleinto Order to Show Cause18 (Olson, Eric)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
18 18 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Wed 09/18 10:13 AM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) Order to Show Cause by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 9/23/2024. (twdb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
17 17 misc Brief (non-motion non-appeal) Wed 09/11 1:46 PM
BRIEF filed by Debtor. Appellant. Defendant Leslie Klein.(Olson, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix Appellant's Appendix to Brief 1 of 3,
Att: 2 Appendix Appellant's Appendix to Brief 2 of 3,
Att: 3 Appendix Appellant's Appendix to Brief 3 of 3
Monday, August 12, 2024
16 16 bankruptcy Notice Re: Bankruptcy Record Complete (CV-8) - optional html form Mon 08/12 1:53 PM
NOTICE RE: BANKRUPTCY RECORD COMPLETE. Please note, pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8010(b)(3), this Court has received from the Clerk of the Bankruptcy Court either the record for the above-captioned appeal or notice that the record is available electronically. The parties are responsible for reading and complying with all requirements, including briefing, provided in this notice. Appellant must serve and file a brief by 9/11/2024. (twdb)
Related: [-]
15 15 appeal Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability Mon 08/12 1:52 PM
Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability : CERTIFICATE OF READINESS AND COMPLETION OF RECORD ON APPEAL re Notice of Appeal1 (twdb)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
14 14 notice Related Case(s) Mon 07/01 2:14 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Appellant Defendant Leslie Klein. Amended Notice of Related Cases Related Case(s): 2:24-cv-03344-JGB; 2:24-cv-04607-FWS; 2:24-cv-03543-DMG (Olson, Eric)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
13 13 appeal Designation of Record on Appeal Mon 06/10 11:14 AM
FIRST AMENDED DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal by appellant Leslie Klein(Olson, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit DOCKET - ADV,
Att: 2 Exhibit DOCKET- MAIN,
Att: 3 Exhibit AMENDED NOT OF APPEAL WITH COPY OF ORDER,
Att: 4 Exhibit TRANSCRIPTS
Friday, May 31, 2024
12 12 order Transferring Case (Related Case)(CV-34) Fri 05/31 2:54 PM
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT to this Court's General Order in the Matter of Assignment of Cases and Duties to the District Judges Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:23-cv-09541-JGB. Case transferred from Judge Fred W. Slaughter to Judge Jesus G. Bernal for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:24-cv-03344-JGB. Signed by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (aco)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
10 10 notice Related Case(s) Mon 05/13 2:33 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by appellant Leslie Klein. Related Case(s): 2:23-cv-09541 - jgb; 2:24-cv-03543 - dmg (Olson, Eric)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Miscellaneous Document Mon 05/13 2:23 PM
certification & notice of interested parties filed by Appellant Leslie Klein re: Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court Order/Judgment,3 , Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court Order/Judgment,2 , Notice of Related Case(s),8 , Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court Order/Judgment,,1 , Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court Order/Judgment,4 , Notice Regarding Appeal from Bankruptcy Court (CV-26) - optional html form5 (Olson, Eric)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
8 8 notice Related Case(s) Fri 05/10 11:11 AM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Appellee / Judgment Creditor David Berger. Related Case(s): 2:23-cv-09541-JGB, Leslie Klein vs. Robert & Esther Mermelstein, USDC Case No. Not Yet Assigned, filed 4 22-2024 2:24-cv-03543-DMG (Cohen, Baruch)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2024
11 11 bankruptcy Notice of Document Discrepancy (Bankruptcy Appeal) Tue 05/14 12:31 PM
NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY APPEAL DOCUMENT DISCREPANCY regarding Statement of Issues, Designation of Record, and Notice of Transcript forwarded to Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (jp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
7 7 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 04/24 2:47 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
Related: [-]
5 5 bankruptcy Notice Regarding Appeal from Bankruptcy Court (CV-26) - optional html form Wed 04/24 2:45 PM
NOTICE REGARDING APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. The appeal has been assigned to Judge Fred W. Slaughter. Refer to the Notice for specifics. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
6 6 bankruptcy Notice of Referral of Appeal (Adversary) - Bankruptcy Wed 04/24 2:46 PM
NOTICE OF REFERRAL OF APPEAL (ADVERSARY) prepared by the United States Bankruptcy Court on 4/23/2024. (ghap)
Related: [-]
4 4 cmp Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court Order/Judgment Wed 04/24 2:42 PM
AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL AND STATEMENT OF ELECTION: Re: Order Denying Motion for Relief from Judgment Including Reconsideration (FRBP 9024) or New Trial (FRBP 9023) entered on 4/10/24 by Bankruptcy Judge Sandra R Klein, filed in the Bankruptcy Court on 4/23/2024. Bankruptcy Court case number: 2:23-bk-10990-SK, Adversary number: 2:23-ap-1153-SK, BAP case number: N/A., filed by appellant Leslie Klein. (ghap)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court Order/Judgment Wed 04/24 2:39 PM
AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL AND STATEMENT OF ELECTION: Re: Judgment for Nondischargeability of Debt Pursuant to 11 USC 523 (A)(2)(A), 11 USC 523 (A)(4) and 11 USC 523 (A)(6) in the amount of $21,737,740.70 entered on 2/16/2024 by Bankruptcy Judge Sandra R Klein, filed in the Bankruptcy Court on 4/23/2024. Bankruptcy Court case number: 2:23-bk-10990-SK, Adversary number: 2:23-ap-1153-SK, BAP case number: N/A., filed by appellant Leslie Klein. (ghap)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court Order/Judgment Wed 04/24 2:33 PM
AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL AND STATEMENT OF ELECTION: Re: Order Denying Motion for Relief from Judgment Including Reconsideration (FRBP 9024) or New Trial (FRBP 9023) entered on 4/10/24 by Bankruptcy Judge Sandra R Klein, filed in the Bankruptcy Court on 4/22/2024. Bankruptcy Court case number: 2:23-bk-10990-SK, Adversary number: 2:23-ap-1169-SK, BAP case number: N/A., filed by appellant Leslie Klein. (ghap)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court Order/Judgment Wed 04/24 2:28 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL AND STATEMENT OF ELECTION: Re: Amended Judgment for Nondischargeability of Debt Pursuant to 11 USC 523 (A)(2)(A), 11 USC 523(A)(4) and 11 USC 523 (A) (6) in the amount of $7,401,369.86 entered on 2/22/2024 by Bankruptcy Judge Sandra R Klein, filed in the Bankruptcy Court on 4/22/2024. Bankruptcy Court case number: 2:23-bk-10990-SK, Adversary number: 2:23-ap-1169-SK, BAP case number: N/A., filed by appellant Leslie Klein. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 BK Docket Sheets,
Att: 2 AP Docket Sheets