New York Western District Court
Case #: 1:24-cr-00060
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Apr 25, 2024 3:20 AM EDT
Defendant
Gregory Trotter (1)
Represented By
Donald M. Thompson
contact info
Joseph M. LaTona
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Joseph M. Tripi
U.S. Attorney'S Office - Buf
contact info
Douglas A. Penrose
U.S. Attorney'S Office - Buf
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 4:09 AM EDT
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Gregory Trotter (1). (EG) [1:23-mj-01173-JJM]
Related: [-]
3 3 Order to Seal Case as to Gregory Trotter. Signed by Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy on 11/28/2023. (EG) [1:23-mj-01173-JJM]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy: Initial Appearance as to Gregory Trotter held on 12/5/2023. Defendant acknowledges receipt of the criminal complaint and supporting affidavit. Government summarizes charges and potential penalties. The court advised defendant of his rights including the right to counsel. Attorney Joseph M. LaTona appears with defendant. He is not retained and understands there is a potential conflict. He will appear for today's purposes and refer to another attorney. Defendant agrees that Mr. Latona may represent him today. Defendant reserves his right to request a preliminary hearing pending appearance of counsel. The parties acknowledge receipt of the pretrial services report. Government is not moving for detention. Agrees with conditions in the report, requests additional conditions of staying away from Pharaoh's and no contact with defendants in related cases, with a list of such persons to be provided to the defense by the government, but specifically including Peter Gerace, Jr. Defendant agrees to the conditions as outlined on the record and in the pretrial services report. Defendant agrees to relinquish firearms as described by USPO Mamizuka. The government agrees that defendant will surrender his passport to his attorney. An attorney appointment hearing is set for 12/20/2023 at 2:00 p.m. in the Genesee Courtroom, 6th Floor West, 2 Niagara Square, Buffalo. The court excludes time to ensure continuity of counsel. The parties agree. The court delivers the DPPA admonition and the government acknowledges its obligations. Order to follow. APPEARANCES: AUSAs D. Penrose and J. Tripi; defendant with J. LaTona; USPO B. Mamizuka. (FTR Gold) (JD) Modified on 12/5/2023 (JD). [1:23-mj-01173-JJM]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER re Due Process Protections Act admonition re the government's Brady obligations as to Gregory Trotter. Signed by Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy on 12/5/2023. (JD) [1:23-mj-01173-JJM]
Related: [-]
Friday, December 08, 2023
6 6 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Signed by Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy on 12/5/2023. (EG) [1:23-mj-01173-JJM]
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
7 7 First MOTION to Adjourn Attorney Appointment Hearing by USA as to Gregory Trotter. (Penrose, Douglas) [1:23-mj-01173-JJM]
Related: [-]
8 8 TEXT ORDER as to Gregory Trotter: The government's unopposed Motion to Adjourn7 the December 20th attorney appearance is granted. That appearance is rescheduled to January 3, 2024 at 3:00 p.m. in Genesee Courtroom, 6th Floor West, 2 Niagara Square, Buffalo, NY before Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy. The time through that date is excluded from the Speedy Trial Act calendar in the interests of justice and effective representation of counsel pursuant to Title 18 U.S.C. 3161(h)(7)(A) and 3161(h)(7)(B)(iv). SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy on 12/18/2023. (EG) A copy was emailed to Don Thompson, Esq. [1:23-mj-01173-JJM]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
9 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy: Attorney Appointment Hearing as to Gregory Trotter held on 1/3/2024. Attorney Donald M. Thompson appears with Gregory Trotter and states that he is not yet retained but expects to be fully retained soon. At his request, a further Status Conference is set for 1/24/2024 at 11:00 AM in the Genesee Courtroom, 6th Floor West, 2 Niagara Square, Buffalo, NY before Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy. STA time is excluded in the interest of justice for the reasons stated. APPEARANCES: AUSA Douglas Penrose; Defendant with Donald Thompson (FTR Gold) (EG) [1:23-mj-01173-JJM]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
10 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy: Status Conference as to Gregory Trotter held on 1/24/2024. The parties appear. Defense counsel states that he is fully retained. Defendant waives a preliminary hearing. Defendant requests another status conference be set so he can advise as to the status of discovery review. The government requests a 90-day Rule 48(b) deadline be set. The court sets a further Status Conference for February 21, 2024 at 11:00 AM in the Wyoming Courtroom, 5th Floor East, 2 Niagara Square, Buffalo, NY before Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy. STA time excluded for the reasons stated by the government. APPEARANCES: AUSA D. Penrose; Defendant with D. Thompson (FTR Gold) (EG) [1:23-mj-01173-JJM]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
11 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy: Status Conference as to Gregory Trotter held on 2/21/2024. Counsel for the parties appear by video conference by request; defendant waives appearance. Defendant gives update regarding status of discovery review, indicates that expert review is still required. After discussion with counsel, the court sets a Rule 48(b) dismissal date without prejudice to a motion to extend if needed for technical review. Rule 48(b) date set. STA time excluded on joint motion of the parties for the reasons stated. APPEARANCES (by video): AUSA D. Penrose; Defendant with D. Thompson (FTR Gold) (EG) [1:23-mj-01173-JJM]
Related: [-]
12 12 TEXT ORDER as to Gregory Trotter: As agreed to by the parties, pursuant to Fed. R. Crim. P. ("Rule") 48(b), the Complaint will be automatically dismissed, without prejudice, on April 24, 2024 at 12:00 p.m. without the need for a further order. The Rule 48(b) deadline will not be extended for ongoing plea negotiations short of an actual plea agreement. Defendant may accelerate the Rule 48(b) dismissal deadline by filing a notice to that effect, in which case the dismissal will occur (without further order) at 12:00 p.m. on the 10th business day thereafter; provided, however, that in no event will the dismissal occur less than 30 or more than 90 days from today's date, unless extended by the court for reasons other than ongoing plea negotiations. Any defendant who is in custody on the Complaint and not subject to another detainer or warrant at that time of the dismissal shall immediately be released from custody, and the conditions of release (including bail) imposed as a result of the Complaint as to any defendant who is not in custody at that time shall immediately terminate. For the reasons stated by the government and agreed to by defendant, the ends of justice served by this continuance outweigh the best interest of the public and defendant in a speedy trial, and the time between today and April 24, 2024 is therefore excluded from the Speedy Trial Act calendar pursuant to 18 U.S.C. Sections 3161(h)(7)(A) and 3161(h)(7)(B)(iv). SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy on 2/21/2024. (EG) [1:23-mj-01173-JJM]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
14 14 INDICTMENT as to Gregory Trotter (1) count(s) 1. (TMK)
Related: [-]
15 15 Sealed Unredacted Document as to Gregory Trotter filed pursuant to FRCrP 49.1. (TMK)
Related: [-]
16 16 TEXT ORDER OF REFERRAL Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy, United States Magistrate Judge, is hereby designated to act in this case as follows: All pre-trial matters in this case are referred to the above-named United States Magistrate Judge, including all pre-trial matters that a Magistrate Judge may hear and determine pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(b)(1)(A), and those which a Magistrate Judge may hear and thereafter file a report and recommendation for disposition pursuant to Section 636(b)(1)(B). All procedural aspects of matters properly before the Magistrate Judge under this Order, including scheduling and the filing of briefs or other supporting material, shall be determined by the Magistrate Judge. All motions or applications shall be filed with the Clerk and made returnable before the Magistrate Judge. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 4/23/2024.(TMK)
Related: [-]