Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 7:24-mj-00658
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Apr 25, 2024 2:22 AM CDT
Defendant
Jesus Maldonado-Chavez (1)
Represented By
Federal Public Defender - McAllen
contact info
Jose Angel Martinez, Jr.
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Miroslava Alexis Garcia
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 3:11 AM CDT
Monday, April 22, 2024
Arrest of Jesus Maldonado-Chavez, filed. (adg7)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
US ATTORNEY'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE. Miroslava Alexis Garcia appearing for USA, filed. (Garcia, Miroslava)
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nadia S Medrano. INITIAL APPEARANCE on Criminal Complaint as to Jesus Maldonado-Chavez held on 4/23/2024. (Deft informed of rights.) Defendant requests appointed counsel. Deft examined as to Financial Affidavit. Court grants. Court grants appointed counsel and Able Guerrero, AFPD, was present for the proceedings. Deft, assisted by counsel, waivied Preliminary Examination and Detention Hearing. Court finds Probablale Cause. Defendant detained without bond pending trail. The Court advised Defendant of the right to have a consular official notified about the arrest. In accordance with Rule 5(f), the Court orally reminded the Government of its disclosure obligations under Brady and the consequences of failing to provide such disclosure; written order to follow. (Time in court: 9:50 10:22) Appearances: Eric Flores, AUSA; Abel Guerrero, AFPD. (PTS: Alicia Trevino) (ERO: Sandra Ann Silva) (Interpreter: Woody Lewis and Maria E. Barrett/used) (DUSM: Letty Torres) Deft remanded to custody. (cr7)
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Jose Angel Martinez, Jr, Federal Public Defender, in case as to Jesus Maldonado-Chavez, filed. (Martinez, Jose)
Related: [-]
1 1 CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Jesus Maldonado-Chavez (1), filed. Initial Appearance set for 4/23/2024 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nadia S Medrano (adg7)
Related: [-]
2 2 AO 257 Information Sheet as to Jesus Maldonado-Chavez, filed. (adg7)
Related: [-]
3 3 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Jesus Maldonado-Chavez, filed.
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER for Jesus Maldonado-Chavez (Signed by Magistrate Judge Nadia S Medrano) Parties notified. (cr7)
Related: [-]
5 5 BRADY ORDER on Rule 5(f) as to Jesus Maldonado-Chavez. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Nadia S Medrano) Parties notified. (cr7)
Related: [-]