Florida Middle District Court
Judge:John E Steele
Referred: Nicholas P Mizell
Case #: 2:24-cv-00378
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Apr 25, 2024
Terminated:May 12, 2025
Case in other court:Lee County Circuit Court, 24-CA-000067
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 22, 2024 4:33 AM EDT
Defendant
Walmart Stores East, LP
Represented By
Amanda J. Sharkey Ross
Henderson Franklin Starnes & Holt, P.A.
contact info
Steven Conrad Gendreau
Henderson Franklin Starnes & Holt, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Kristin English
Represented By
Patrick Graves
Morgan And Morgan, P.A.
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Jane Doe
Terminated: 06/06/2024
Represented By
Steven Conrad Gendreau
Henderson Franklin Starnes & Holt, PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Monday, May 12, 2025
29 29 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Mon 05/12 12:30 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (ARL)
Related: [-]
28 28 2 pgs order Order Administratively Closing Case Mon 05/12 9:36 AM
ORDER directing administrative closure for 30 days. All motions and deadlines are terminated in light of the administrative closure. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 5/12/2025. (RKR)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
27 27 notice Notice of settlement Fri 05/09 8:06 AM
NOTICE of settlement by Walmart Stores East, LP (Gendreau, Steven)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
26 26 order Order Mon 04/14 10:28 AM
TEXT ORDER. The parties filed a mediation report. (Doc. 25 ). The parties are reminded that the mediation deadline remains July 11, 2025. (Doc. 22 ). They are encouraged to exhaust mediation efforts until that date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 4/14/2025. (RCD)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
25 25 adr Mediation report Fri 04/04 2:04 PM
MEDIATION report Hearing held on 4/4/2025. Hearing outcome: Impasse.. (Truitt, Curtright)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
24 24 notice Notice of mediation conference/hearing Thu 10/31 12:22 PM
NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on 04/04/25 9:00 a.m. before Curt Truitt. (Gendreau, Steven)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
23 23 notice Notice of mediation conference/hearing Tue 10/29 1:46 PM
ATTORNEY NOTIFIED OF DATE DISCREPANCY. NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on 04/04/25 9:00 a.m. before Curt Truitt. (Gendreau, Steven) Modified docket text on 10/30/2024 (EVK)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
22 22 order Case Management Scheduling Order Thu 06/20 11:07 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Dispositive motions due by 8/1/2025 Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/30/2026 at 09:30 AM before Judge John E. Steele Jury Trial term 2/2/2026 at 09:00 AM before Judge John E. Steele Conduct mediation hearing by 7/11/2025. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 6/20/2024. (WRW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
21 21 minutes Preliminary pretrial conference Tue 06/18 11:52 AM
Minute Entry. Telephonic Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell: Rule 16(b) Conference held on 6/18/2024. (digital) (WRW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
20 20 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 06/06 3:33 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re9 Civil Action Order by Kristin English. (Graves, Patrick)
Related: [-]
19 19 order Order directing compliance Thu 06/06 10:22 AM
TEXT ORDER: Local Rule 3.03 requires that each party file a disclosure statement using the standard form from the clerk or the court's website. However, in filing her disclosure, plaintiff used an outdated form. As such, the paper is deemed stricken, and the clerk is directed to delete the PDF file (Doc. 17) from the CM/ECF docket. By June 14, 2024, plaintiff must refile her disclosure statement using the proper form, which can be found at: https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/form/disclosure-statement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 6/6/2024. (JMM)
Related: [-]
18 18 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 06/06 9:19 AM
ORDER granting 12 Motion to Dismiss and Jane Doe is deemed dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk shall terminate this defendant on the docket and correct the caption of the case to reflect the dismissal. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 6/6/2024. (RKR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
17 17 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 06/05 4:07 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re9 Civil Action Order by Kristin English. (Graves, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
16 16 misc Supplement Tue 06/04 3:32 PM
SUPPLEMENT re12 MOTION to Dismiss failure to serve process (limited appearance) by Jane Doe. (Gendreau, Steven)
Related: [-]
15 15 2 pgs order Order directing response to motion Tue 06/04 11:29 AM
ORDER directing Kristin English to respond to Jane Doe's 12 Motion to Dismiss for failure to serve process within seven (7) days of this Order. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 6/4/2024. (FMB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
14 14 notice Notice of a Related Action Thu 05/23 12:09 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Walmart Stores East, LP. Related case(s): No (Sharkey Ross, Amanda)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Case Management Report Thu 05/23 12:08 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Gendreau, Steven)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
12 12 motion Dismiss Mon 05/13 11:21 AM
MOTION to Dismiss failure to serve process (limited appearance) by Jane Doe. (Gendreau, Steven)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of Hearing Mon 04/29 1:46 PM
NOTICE of hearing: Rule 16(b) Conference set for 6/18/2024 at 10:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. Parties shall file a Case Management Report by 6/10/2024. All parties shall appear telephonically. The toll-free teleconference number is 1-877-873-8018. The access code is 5997085. You will then be prompted to enter a participant security code: 24378. All parties are encouraged to utilize a landline or similarly stable connection free of ambient interference to avoid having any portion of the conference conducted without them. (WRW)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of appearance Mon 04/29 11:59 AM
NOTICE of Appearance Appearance by Patrick Graves on behalf of Kristin English (Graves, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
9 9 order Civil Action Order Fri 04/26 2:10 PM
CIVIL Action Order Signed by All Divisional Judges on 4/26/2024. (WRW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 04/25 2:23 PM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 7 Complaint with Jury Demand by Walmart Stores East, LP. Filed in State Court 01/18/2024(ARL)
Related: [-]
7 7 8 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 04/25 2:22 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by Kristin English. Filed in State Court 12/29/2023(ARL)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 04/25 2:07 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Walmart Stores East, LP. (Sharkey Ross, Amanda)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Thu 04/25 1:58 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Amanda J. Sharkey Ross on behalf of Walmart Stores East, LP. Lead Counsel: Amanda J. Sharkey Ross. (Sharkey Ross, Amanda)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of appearance Thu 04/25 1:56 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Conrad Gendreau on behalf of Walmart Stores East, LP (Gendreau, Steven)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Thu 04/25 11:49 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Patrick Graves, Steven Conrad Gendreau and Amanda J. Sharkey Ross of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AJS)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 04/25 11:48 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John E. Steele and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:24-cv-378-JES-NPM. (AJS)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 04/25 10:13 AM
COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Lee County Circuit Court, case number 24-CA-000067 filed in State Court on 12/29/23. Filing fee $405, receipt number AFLMDC-22022317 filed by Walmart Stores East, LP.(Sharkey Ross, Amanda) Modified on 4/25/2024 as to docket text (ARL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 State Court COMPLAINT Exh. A
Att: 2 State Court Other Documents Exh. B - State Court Pleadings,
Att: 3 State Court Other Documents Exh. C - Pltf's RRFA,
Att: 4 State Court Other Documents Exh. D - Pltf's Ans to ROGS, redacted,
Att: 5 State Court ANSWER ,
Att: 6 State Court Docket Sheet,
Att: 7 Civil Cover Sheet