Alexander v. F.S.R. TRUCKING, INC.
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Donald M Middlebrooks |
Case #: | 9:24-cv-80518 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Apr 25, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Fifteenth Judicial Circuit, 50-02024-CA- 002727 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 25, 2024 12:10 PM EDT |
Defendant
F.S.R. TRUCKING, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Juan Alexander
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Tue 04/30 7:14 PM
Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or for More Definite Statement and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by F.S.R. TRUCKING, INC.. Responses due by 5/14/2024. (Groschel, Cristina) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 04/25 11:59 AM
Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by F.S.R. TRUCKING, INC. (Groschel, Cristina) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Striking
Thu 04/25 11:56 AM
NOTICE of Striking3 Notice (Other) filed by F.S.R. TRUCKING, INC. by F.S.R. TRUCKING, INC. (Groschel, Cristina) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney
Thu 04/25 11:43 AM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re3 Notice (Other). Wrong Event Selected - Document is a Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement ; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED WITHIN 3 DAYS - The Filer must File a Notice of Striking, then refile the document using the Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement event and ensure all Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents are entered. Note - Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents do not appear on the docket sheet. (cds) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 04/25 11:41 AM
(STRICKEN PER DE#5 ) Defendant's NOTICE Corporate Disclosure Statement by F.S.R. TRUCKING, INC. (Groschel, Cristina) Modified Text on 4/25/2024 (cds) |
|
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Thu 04/25 11:18 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint)
Thu 04/25 11:07 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17477508, filed by F.S.R. TRUCKING, INC..(Groschel, Cristina) Modified Text on 4/25/2024 (cds) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |