Louisiana Western District Court
Judge:David C Joseph
Referred: Carol B Whitehurst
Case #: 6:24-cv-00548
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1346 Tort Claim
Case Filed:Apr 29, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Oct 26, 2024 5:03 AM CDT
Defendant
USA
Represented By
LaKeisha A Ford
U S Attorneys Office (laf)
contact info
Plaintiff
Felicia Carmouche
Represented By
Rodger Gregory Green, Jr
Gordon Mckernan Injury Attorneys (laf)
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, February 14, 2025
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney Fri 02/14 1:05 PM
ORDER granting13 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Desiree C Williams for USA. Attorney LaKeisha A Ford terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 2/14/2025. (crt,Miletello, A)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
13 13 motion Substitute Attorney Thu 02/13 2:18 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney Desiree C. Williams in place of LaKeisha A. Ford by USA. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/13/2025.(Attorney Desiree C Williams added to party USA(pty:dft))(aty,Williams, Desiree)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed order
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
12 12 order Scheduling Order - Joseph Tue 09/03 4:09 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Bench Trial set for 9/8/2025 at 9:00 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 1 before Judge David C Joseph. Pretrial Conference set for 8/13/2025 at 11:00 AM in chambers before Judge David C Joseph. Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadings due by 1/15/2025. Plaintiffs Expert Info/Reports due by 1/15/2025. Defendants Expert Info/Reports due by 2/14/2025. Discovery deadline 3/17/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 4/15/2025. Daubert Motions due by 4/15/2025. Motions in Limine due by 7/14/2025. Pretrial Order due by 8/6/2025. Affirmation of Settlement Negotiations due 8/6/2025. Trial Depositions due by 8/6/2025. Bench Books due by 9/2/2025. Real Time glossary due by 9/2/2025. Signed by Judge David C Joseph on 9/3/2024. (crt,LaCombe, L)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2024
11 11 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines Thu 08/29 5:27 PM
ORDER: Bench Trial set for 9/8/2025 09:00 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 1 before Judge David C Joseph. Pretrial Conference set for 8/13/2025 11:00 AM in chambers before Judge David C Joseph. The Clerk of Court shall issue a scheduling order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 8/29/2024. (crt,Kiper, C)
Related: [-]
10 10 minutes Scheduling Conference Thu 08/29 5:23 PM
MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst: TELEPHONE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 8/29/2024. (crt,Kiper, C)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
9 9 order Order Allowing Rule 26 Report Mon 08/26 10:12 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' Rule 26(f) Report, IT IS ORDERED that the report is found to be complete. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 8/26/2024. (crt,Coreil, H)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Jurisdictional Review Finding Mon 08/26 10:11 AM
ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 USC 1346. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 8/26/2024. (crt,Coreil, H)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2024
7 7 misc Rule 26(f) Report Fri 08/23 12:12 PM
JOINT RULE 26(f) Report by USA, Felicia Carmouche. (aty,Ford, LaKeisha) Modified filer on 8/23/2024 (Miletello, A)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
6 6 order Order Setting Scheduling Conference Thu 08/08 11:36 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: A telephone scheduling conference is set for 8/29/2024 at 10:00 AM by phone before Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. In preparation for the teleconference, the parties shall exchange initial disclosures and file a joint Rule 26(f) report into the record by 8/23/2024. During the teleconference, the parties shall be prepared to discuss the status of the case, any issues requiring the Courts consideration, and the scheduling of pretrial conference and trial dates. The parties will join the teleconference by dialing 877-336-1839 and entering access code 2869540. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 8/8/2024. (crt,Coreil, H)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2024
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 06/28 2:18 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by USA.(Attorney LaKeisha A Ford added to party USA(pty:dft))(aty,Ford, LaKeisha)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
misc Remark (Public) Tue 06/18 3:29 PM
REMARK: A duplicate charge was incurred during a new filing. A refund of the duplicate payment of $405.00, receipt #ALAWDC-5929090, has been processed in pay.gov this date. The attorney is advised to verify the refund on their statement. (crt,Burns, P)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued - USA (Form Included) Mon 04/29 2:51 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to U S Attorney, U S Attorney General, U S Postal Service. (crt,Miletello, A)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corrective Document Mon 04/29 12:17 PM
CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Complaint filed by Felicia Carmouche regarding1 Complaint .(aty,Green, Rodger)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil cover sheet
2 2 misc Exhibit Mon 04/29 11:10 AM
EXHIBIT re1 Complaint by Felicia Carmouche.(aty,Green, Rodger) Modified docket text on 4/29/2024 (Miletello, A)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 04/29 11:02 AM
COMPLAINT against USA (Filing fee $405, receipt number ALAWDC-5929099) filed by Felicia Carmouche.(Attorney Rodger Gregory Green, Jr added to party Felicia Carmouche(pty:pla))(aty,Green, Rodger) Modified on 4/29/2024 to indicate3 Corrected Complaint submitted (Miletello, A)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil cover sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 04/29 2:43 PM
CASE Assigned to Judge David C Joseph and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Miletello, A)
Related: [-]