New Jersey District Court
Judge:Susan D Wigenton
Referred: Andre M Espinosa
Case #: 2:24-cv-05628
Nature of Suit485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Cause47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:Apr 25, 2024
Terminated:Mar 17, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 22, 2024 4:43 AM EDT
Defendant
SELECT HOME WARRANTY, LLC
Represented By
ANTHONY WAYNE VAUGHN, JR
Law Office Of Anthony W. Vaughn, Jr. LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
DEROUHE SHEGIAN
Represented By
RACHEL NICOLE DAPEER
Dapeer Law, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, March 17, 2025
18 18 order Stipulation and Order Mon 03/17 11:41 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 3/17/2025. (ld)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Mon 03/17 11:42 AM
***Civil Case Terminated. (ld)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
17 17 misc Stipulation of Dismissal (aty) Fri 03/14 3:55 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice by DEROUHE SHEGIAN. (DAPEER, RACHEL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
16 16 order Text Order Thu 01/30 5:50 PM
TEXT ORDER The Court will hold a telephonic conference on May 13, 2025, at 2:00 p.m. , to be joined by dialing 973-437-5535, access code 474 625 727#. A joint status letter shall be filed on or before May 9, 2025. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 1/30/2025. (mp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
minutes Telephone Conference Mon 02/03 8:13 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa: Telephone Conference held on 1/29/2025. (jd, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
15 15 misc Letter Wed 01/22 4:17 PM
Letter from Parties. (DAPEER, RACHEL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
14 14 order Scheduling Order Tue 11/12 9:01 PM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER:Telephone Status Conference set for 1/29/2025 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa. Amended Pleadings due by 1/31/2025. Fact Discovery due by 5/15/2025. Joinder of Parties due by 1/31/2025.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 11/12/2024. (ld, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Tue 11/26 4:30 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 11/5/2024. (jd, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
13 13 discov Joint Discovery Plan Wed 10/23 4:55 PM
Joint Discovery Plan by DEROUHE SHEGIAN.(DAPEER, RACHEL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
12 12 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 10/15 1:03 PM
ORDER granting10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to MANUEL HIRALDO, ESQ.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 10/15/2024. (ld, )
Related: [-]
11 11 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 10/15 1:01 PM
ORDER granting9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to EDWARD A. MALDONADO, ESQ.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 10/15/2024. (ld, )
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 10/15 9:38 AM
Set Deadlines as to9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 11/4/2024 before Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (and)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 10/15 9:39 AM
Set Deadlines as to10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Manuel Hirlado, Esq. . Motion set for 11/18/2024 before Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (and)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 14, 2024
10 10 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 10/14 3:01 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Manuel Hirlado, Esq. by DEROUHE SHEGIAN.(DAPEER, RACHEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Certification of Manuel Hiraldo for pro hac vice admission,
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Filing and Service,
Att: 3 Exhibit Certification of Rachel Dapeer in Support for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Manuel Hiraldo,
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice of Manuel Hiraldo
Friday, October 11, 2024
9 9 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 10/11 10:09 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by SELECT HOME WARRANTY, LLC.(VAUGHN, ANTHONY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of Maldonado in support of Pro Hac Vice Motion,
Att: 2 Declaration Declaration of Anthony Vaughn, Jr. in support of application for pro hac vice admission,
Att: 3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
8 8 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Wed 10/02 10:54 AM
ORDER Scheduling Initial R16 Conference for 11/5/2024 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 10/2/2024. (spc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 06/27 1:29 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by SELECT HOME WARRANTY, LLC.(VAUGHN, ANTHONY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A-,
Att: 2 Certification Notice of Service
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
6 6 3 pgs order Order Tue 06/04 5:17 PM
CONSENT ORDER that Defendant Select Home Warranty LLC's request for a thirty (30) day extension of time to answer the Complaint is hereby granted; that the deadline for Defendant Select Home Warranty LLC to file an Answer to the Complaint is June 29, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 6/4/2024. (ld, )
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
5 5 misc Proposed Order Mon 06/03 5:16 PM
Proposed Order Proposed Consent Order for Extension of Time to File an Answer by SELECT HOME WARRANTY, LLC. (VAUGHN, ANTHONY)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 06/03 4:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ANTHONY WAYNE VAUGHN, JR on behalf of SELECT HOME WARRANTY, LLC(VAUGHN, ANTHONY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service
3 3 service Certificate of Service Mon 06/03 3:29 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by DEROUHE SHEGIAN (DAPEER, RACHEL)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 04/26 9:35 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to SELECT HOME WARRANTY, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (sm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
1 1 9 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 04/25 1:25 PM
COMPLAINT against Select Home Waranty, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15316201) with JURY DEMAND, filed by Derouhe Shegian.(DAPEER, RACHEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 04/25 3:43 PM
Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa added. (ps)
Related: [-]