Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:23-bk-03099

Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Jason A Burgess
Case #: 3:24-ap-00048
Nature of Suit41 Bankruptcy - Objection / revocation of discharge - §727(c),(d),(e)
Case Filed:Apr 24, 2024
Terminated:Jun 24, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Cameron Mackenzie-Lynn Triggs
3701 Danforth Drive South Apt.#917
Jacksonville, FL 32224
Represented By
Cameron Mackenzie-Lynn Triggs
contact info
Plaintiff
Gordon P. Jones, Chapter 7 Trustee
100 North Laura Street, Suite 701
Jacksonville, FL 32202
Represented By
Eugene H Johnson
Johnson Law Firm, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Monday, June 24, 2024
court Close Adversary Case Mon 06/24 8:28 AM
Adversary Case 3:24-ap-48 Closed. (Ryan S.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 06/07 12:21 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 06/06/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #9 )
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
10 10 misc Proof of Service (AP) Tue 06/04 12:58 PM
Proof of Service of Order Granting Motion For Default Judgment Against Defendant, Cameron Mackenzie-Lynn Triggs. Filed by Eugene H Johnson on behalf of Plaintiff Gordon P. Jones, Chapter 7 Trustee Related [+]. (Johnson, Eugene)
Related: [-] 8
9 9 order Judgment Tue 06/04 12:56 PM
Judgment in Favor of Plaintiff (Discharge is Denied) Amount Awarded: $350.00 Related [+]. Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Margaret)
Related: [-] 8
8 8 order Default Judgment Tue 06/04 12:53 PM
Order Granting Motion For Default Judgment Against Defendant, Cameron Mackenzie-Lynn Triggs Related [+]. Service Instructions: Eugene Johnson is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Margaret)
Related: [-] 7
7 7 motion Motion for Default Judgment Tue 06/04 11:32 AM
Motion for Default Judgment against Defendant Cameron Mackenzie-Lynn Triggs Filed by Eugene H Johnson on behalf of Plaintiff Gordon P. Jones, Chapter 7 Trustee Related [+]. (Johnson, Eugene)
Related: [-] 5
Saturday, June 01, 2024
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest Sun 06/02 12:37 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest Related [+]. Notice Date 06/01/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #5 )
Thursday, May 30, 2024
5 5 court Clerks Entry of Default Thu 05/30 9:27 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant Service Instructions: Clerks Office to Serve Related [+]. (Penny)
Related: [-] 4
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
4 4 motion Motion for Entry of Default (AP) Wed 05/29 9:49 AM
Motion for Entry of Default against Defendant, Cameron Mackenzie-Lynn Triggs Filed by Eugene H Johnson on behalf of Plaintiff Gordon P. Jones, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Johnson, Eugene)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
3 3 misc Summons Service Executed Thu 04/25 12:08 PM
Service Executed on Defendant, Cameron Mackenzie-Lynn Triggs of Summons, Complaint, Local Rule 7001-1. Filed by Eugene H Johnson on behalf of Plaintiff Gordon P. Jones, Chapter 7 Trustee Related [+]. (Johnson, Eugene)
Related: [-] 2 ,1
2 2 court ADI - Summons Issued (auto) Thu 04/25 10:56 AM
Summons issued along with Local Rule 7001-1 - Adversary Proceedings - Procedures. Answer Due 05/27/2024. If one or more defendants are the United States or an officer or agency thereof, add an additional five days to the Answer Due date. A copy of this summons must be included when filing proof of service of this summons. (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
1 1 cmp ADI - Complaint - Original Wed 04/24 4:46 PM
Complaint by Gordon P. Jones, Chapter 7 Trustee against Cameron Mackenzie-Lynn Triggs. Filing Fee Deferred. Nature of Suit: [41 (Objection / Revocation of Discharge - 727(c),(d),(e))]. (Johnson, Eugene)
Related: [-]