Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:24-bk-11328

Maryland Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Michelle M Harner
Case #: 1:24-ap-00097
Nature of Suit62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Apr 25, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Charles E. English
16 Havenfield Dr.
Parkville, MD 21234
Represented By
Charles E. English
contact info
Plaintiff
Aberdeen Proving Ground Federal Credit Union
Silverman Theologou, LLP c/o Michael T. Ondeck, Esq. 11200 Rockville Pike, Suite 520
N. Bethesda, MD 20852
Represented By
Michael Thomas Ondeck
Silverman Theologou, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Friday, May 31, 2024
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (Auto-Docket) Sat 06/01 12:27 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/31/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Order on Motion to Approve Stipulation/Settlement
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
6 6 order Approve Stipulation/Settlement Wed 05/29 7:26 AM
Consent Order Declaring Debt Non-Dischargeable Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 523(a)(2)(A) Related [+]
Related: [-] 5 Motion to Approve Stipulation/Settlement . Notice Served on 4/30/2024, Filed by Aberdeen Proving Ground Federal Credit Union. (Hegerle, Robert
court Close Adversary Case Wed 05/29 7:32 AM
Adversary Case 1:24-ap-97 Closed. (Hegerle, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
5 5 motion Approve Stipulation/Settlement and Notice of Motion Tue 04/30 10:07 AM
Motion to Approve Stipulation/Settlement . Notice Served on 4/30/2024, Filed by Aberdeen Proving Ground Federal Credit Union. Responses due by 5/21/2024. (Ondeck, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Motion
Att: 2 List of All Creditors
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Monday, April 29, 2024
4 4 cmp Affidavit of Summons Service Mon 04/29 11:33 AM
Affidavit of Summons Service Executed on Charles E. English 4/29/2024 . (Ondeck, Michael)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 27, 2024
3 3 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - AP (Auto-Docket) Sun 04/28 12:21 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 04/27/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Thursday, April 25, 2024
2 2 court Summons Issued Thu 04/25 12:04 PM
Summons Issued on Charles E. English Date Issued 4/25/2024, Answer Due 5/28/2024 Related [+]. Pre-Trial Conference set for 05/29/2024 at 10:00 AM by videoconference or teleconference. For hearing access information see www.mdb.uscourts.gov/hearings or call 410-962-2688. (Hegerle, Robert)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Aberdeen Proving Ground Federal Credit Union
1 1 cmp Complaint (Case Opening) Thu 04/25 11:51 AM
Adversary case 24-00097 (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) Complaint by Michael Thomas Ondeck on behalf of Aberdeen Proving Ground Federal Credit Union against Charles E. English. Fee Amount $350. (Ondeck, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent to Entry of Final Orders or Judgments