Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Sarah E Geraghty
Referred: Walter E Johnson
Case #: 1:24-cv-01781
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Apr 24, 2024
Terminated:Nov 19, 2024
Last checked: Monday Oct 21, 2024 4:32 AM EDT
Defendant
Convergent Outsourcing, Inc.
Represented By
Kirsten H. Smith
Sessions, Israel & Shartle LLC
contact info
Defendant
Verizon Wireless Services, LLC
Plaintiff
Manuel Antonio Herrera
Represented By
Octavio Gomez
The Consumer Lawyers PLLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Equifax Information Services LLC
Terminated: 08/22/2024
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Terminated: 09/09/2024
Defendant
Trans Union LLC
Terminated: 06/12/2024


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Tue 11/19 9:06 AM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING26 Stipulation of Dismissal as to Convergent Outsourcing, Inc. pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(ii) (ane)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Tue 11/19 9:07 AM
Civil Case Terminated. Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson terminated from case. (ane)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
26 26 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 11/18 2:37 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Convergent Outsourcing, Inc. by Manuel Antonio Herrera. (Gomez, Octavio)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Mon 10/28 9:17 AM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING25 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Verizon Wireless Services LLC pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i) (ane)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
25 25 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 10/25 9:51 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Verizon Wireless Services LLC filed by Manuel Antonio Herrera (Gomez, Octavio)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
24 24 notice Notice of Settlement Wed 10/16 9:08 AM
NOTICE of Settlement as to Convergent Outsourcing, Inc. by Manuel Antonio Herrera (Gomez, Octavio)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Mon 09/09 12:45 PM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING23 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to as to Experian Information Solutions Inc pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i) (ane)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
23 23 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 09/05 3:49 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Experian Information Solutions Inc filed by Manuel Antonio Herrera (Gomez, Octavio)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Thu 08/22 8:38 AM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING22 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Equifax Information Services LLC pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i) (ane)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
22 22 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 08/21 3:20 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Equifax Information Services LLC filed by Manuel Antonio Herrera (Gomez, Octavio)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
21 21 discov Certificate of Service Wed 08/14 2:53 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures by Manuel Antonio Herrera.(Gomez, Octavio)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
20 20 order Notice to Parties Regarding Summary Judgment Motions Mon 07/22 2:27 PM
NOTICE to Parties Regarding Summary Judgment Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 7/22/24. (klb)
Related: [-]
19 19 order Scheduling Order Mon 07/22 2:27 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: re:18 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. As an initial matter, the undersigned observes that mediation could be successful here, given the parties' indication that there is a possibility of settlement. The Court offers the services of its Magistrate Judges to mediate cases at no cost. Should the parties desire to mediate, they may contact the chambers of the Honorable Russell G. Vineyard (404-215-1375), Chief United States Magistrate Judge. Discovery ends on 11/18/2024. Motions under Local Rule 7.1(A)(2) including motions to amend pleadings due by 8/19/2024. Motions for summary judgment no later than 12/18/2024. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/18/2024, or within thirty days from a final ruling on any motion for summary judgment that is not dispositive of all claims advanced by the parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 7/22/24. (klb)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
18 18 misc Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Fri 07/19 10:14 PM
JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Manuel Antonio Herrera. (Gomez, Octavio)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 19, 2024
17 17 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 06/19 12:11 PM
ANSWER to1 COMPLAINT by Convergent Outsourcing, Inc.. Discovery ends on 11/18/2024.(Smith, Kirsten)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
16 16 notice Notice of Settlement Fri 06/14 8:42 AM
NOTICE of Settlement as to Verizon Wireless Services LLC by Manuel Antonio Herrera (Gomez, Octavio)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
15 15 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 06/13 12:54 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Manuel Antonio Herrera. Verizon Wireless Services, LLC waiver mailed on 5/20/2024, answer due 7/19/2024. (Gomez, Octavio)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Wed 06/12 9:06 AM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING12 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Trans Union LLC pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i) (ane)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
14 14 notice Notice of Settlement Tue 06/11 3:03 PM
NOTICE of Settlement as to Experian Information Solutions Inc by Manuel Antonio Herrera (Gomez, Octavio)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Settlement Tue 06/11 3:03 PM
NOTICE of Settlement as to Equifax Information Services LLC by Manuel Antonio Herrera (Gomez, Octavio)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 06/11 2:43 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Trans Union LLC filed by Manuel Antonio Herrera (Gomez, Octavio)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
11 11 service Return of Service Executed Thu 05/30 4:13 PM
Return of Service Executed by Manuel Antonio Herrera. Trans Union LLC served on 5/21/2024, answer due 6/11/2024. (Gomez, Octavio)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint Wed 05/22 2:44 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Convergent Outsourcing, Inc.. (Smith, Kirsten)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 05/22 3:48 PM
ORAL ORDER granting10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer . Convergent Outsourcing, Inc. Answer due 6/19/2024. Entered by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 5/22/24. (klb)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
9 9 service Return of Service Executed Mon 05/06 11:02 AM
Return of Service Executed by Manuel Antonio Herrera. Convergent Outsourcing, Inc. served on 4/29/2024, answer due 5/20/2024. (Gomez, Octavio)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
8 8 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 04/26 10:48 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Manuel Antonio Herrera. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. waiver mailed on 4/25/2024, answer due 6/24/2024. (Gomez, Octavio)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
7 7 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 04/25 12:51 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Manuel Antonio Herrera. (Gomez, Octavio)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
6 6 service Electronic Summons Issued Thu 04/25 9:19 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Convergent Outsourcing, Inc. (bmr)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Electronic Summons Issued Thu 04/25 9:17 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Verizon Wireless Services, LLC. (bmr)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Electronic Summons Issued Thu 04/25 9:15 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Trans Union LLC. (bmr)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Electronic Summons Issued Thu 04/25 9:14 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (bmr)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued Thu 04/25 9:13 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services LLC. (bmr)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 04/25 9:06 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Manuel Antonio Herrera. (Filing fee $405, receipt number AGANDC-13388164)(bmr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet