New Jersey District Court
Judge:Georgette Castner
Referred: Justin T Quinn
Case #: 3:24-cv-05651
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal- Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Apr 25, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 22, 2024 4:47 AM EDT
Defendant
BOSUN'S ASSETS & OPERATIONS, LLC
Represented By
ELIZABETH NAPERKOWSKI
Gfeller Laurie LLP
contact info
MARK DAVID SHIFTON
Gfeller Laurie LLP
contact info
Defendant
PB HOLDCO, LLC
Represented By
BETH S. ROSE
Sills Cummis & Gross, P.C.
contact info
AHMED JOSEPH KASSIM
Sills Cummis & Gross PC
contact info
Defendant
STONE HARBOR MARINA INC.
Defendant
JOHN DOES (1-10)
Defendant
XYZ CORPORATIONS 1-10
Notice Only
PHV RAECHEL T.X. CONYERS
Notice Only
PHV JEFFREY D. SMITH
Plaintiff
GRACE'S DREAM, LLC
Represented By
JOHN E. URSIN
Schenck, Price, Smith & King, LLP
contact info
MATTHEW PARKER
Schenck Price Smith & King, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
JACOB DAYAN
Represented By
JOHN E. URSIN
Schenck, Price, Smith & King, LLP
contact info
MATTHEW PARKER
Schenck Price Smith & King, LLP
contact info

GPO Feb 05 2025
OPINION. Signed by Judge Georgette Castner on 2/5/2025. (amv)

Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
52 52 order Scheduling Order Wed 04/16 9:40 AM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 6/16/2025 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Justin T. Quinn. Any motion to amend the pleadings or to join new parties, whether by amended or third party complaint, must be filed by 7/30/2025. Fact Discovery is to remain open through 9/30/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin T. Quinn on 4/15/2025. (jal, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Tue 04/15 4:42 PM
TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Justin T. Quinn: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 4/15/2025. (eh, )
Related: [-]