New York Northern District Court
Judge:Brenda K Sannes
Referred: Daniel J Stewart
Case #: 1:22-cv-01385
Nature of Suit375 Other Statutes - False Claims Act
Cause31:3729 False Claims Act - Liability
Case Filed:Dec 27, 2022
Terminated:May 10, 2024
Last checked: Friday Apr 26, 2024 11:07 PM EDT
Defendant
Vance Cohen
Defendant
Queensbury Taxi Cab & Limousine Services, LLC
Plaintiff
David Kearns
Represented By
Edward T. Kang
Kang Haggerty LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
United States of America and the State of New York ex rel David Kearns
Represented By
John D. Hoggan, Jr.
U.S. Department Of Justice - Albany Office
contact info
Emily L. Auletta
New York State Attorney General - Albany
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, May 10, 2024
14 14 order Order Dismissing Case Fri 05/10 2:59 PM
TEXT ORDER: In light of the plaintiff's notice of voluntary dismissal,10 , as well as the State of New York and the United States of America's consent to dismissal,12 ,13 , the clerk of the court is directed to close this case. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Brenda K. Sannes on 5/10/2024. (nmk)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice - Other Fri 05/10 1:58 PM
NOTICE by United States of America and the State of New York ex rel David Kearns Consenting to the Voluntary Dismissal (Auletta, Emily)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
12 12 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 04/26 4:05 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal consenting to the Voluntary Dismissal by United States of America and the State of New York ex rel David Kearns submitted to Judge Sannes. (Hoggan, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
11 11 order Order Thu 04/25 5:00 PM
TEXT ORDER: Relator David Kearns has filed a10 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a), seeking "entry of an order dismissing this False Claims Act qui tam action." Under 31 U.S.C. § 3730(b)(1) the consent of the Attorney General of the United States and this Court are required, and in its9 Order, the Court indicated it would solicit the State of New York's written consent before ruling on a request for dismissal. Accordingly, the government and the State of New York are directed to file letters by 5/9/2024 indicating whether they consent to dismissal, and if so, their reasons for consenting. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Brenda K. Sannes on 4/25/2024. (nmk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 04/25 11:31 AM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL filed by Sealed Plaintiff #1. (nmk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
9 9 ORDER: It is ORDERED that the complaint, the State of New York's Notice of Election to Decline Intervention, the United States' Notice of Election to Decline Intervention, and this order be unsealed and served upon the defendant by the relator. The submissions at docket numbers 2, 4 and 6 remain under seal and not be made public or served upon the defendants. The parties shall serve all pleadings and motions filed in this action upon the United States, and upon the State of New York. The United States and State of New York may order any deposition transcripts and is entitled to intervene in this action, for good cause, at any time. All orders of this court shall be sent to the United States and the State of New York by the relator. Should the relator or the defendants propose that this action be dismissed, settled, or otherwise discontinued, the Court will solicit written consent of the United States and the State of New York before ruling or granting its approval. Signed by Chief Judge Brenda K. Sannes on 4/18/2024. (Copy served upon plaintiff, US and State of NY via email.) (nmk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
8 8 THE UNITED STATES' NOTICE OF ELECTION TO DECLINE INTERVENTION by Sealed Plaintiff #1 (khr)
Related: [-]
7 7 STATE OF NEW YORK'S NOTICE OF ELECTION TO DECLINE INTERVENTION by Sealed Plaintiff #1 (khr)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
6 6 APPLICATION and ORDER filed by the United States of America seeking an extension of time to determine whether it will intervene in this matter submitted to Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. The deadline to intervene is April 8, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 3/15/2024. (gmd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 06, 2023
5 5 ORDER granting the 3 Letter Request filed by the United States of American seeking an extension of time to determine whether or not it will intervene in this matter. The deadline to intervene is March 7, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 9/6/2023.(gmd) (gmd, ).
Related: [-]
4 4 Letter Motion filed by the United States of America seeking an extension of time to determine whether it will intervene in this matter submitted to Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. (gmd) (gmd, ).
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 08, 2023
3 3 ORDER granting the2 Letter Request filed by the United States of American seeking an extension of time to determine whether or not it will intervene in this matter. The deadline to intervene is September 7, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 3/8/2023. (gmd) (jel, ).
Related: [-]
2 2 Letter Motion filed by the United States of America seeking an extension of time to determine whether it will intervene in this matter submitted to Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. (gmd) (jel, ).
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 27, 2022
1 1 FALSE CLAIMS ACT COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Sealed Defendant #1, Sealed Defendant #2 (Filing fee $402 receipt number ALB012622) filed by Sealed Plaintiff #1.(jel, ) (jel, ).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (9/26/2023) Civil Cover Sheet