Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Patricia Tolliver Giles
Referred: Lindsey R Vaala
Case #: 1:24-cv-00675
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 24, 2024
Terminated:Jul 15, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Monday, July 29, 2024
12 12 misc Mail Returned Wed 07/31 4:42 PM
Mail sent to Maunta Banks Returned as Undeliverable. (triv)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
11 11 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 07/15 2:58 PM
ORDERED that this civil action is DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g) for failure to pay the required $405 in case initiation fees. Signed by District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles on 07/15/2024. See Order for further details. (triv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
10 10 misc Docket Annotation Fri 05/31 3:50 PM
Case records from Supreme Court of Mississippi, Court of Appeals filed by Merlin Williams. (triver)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Show Cause Fri 05/31 3:46 PM
MOTION to Show Cause filed by Merlin Williams. (triver)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Miscellaneous Relief (MOTION) Fri 05/31 3:40 PM
MOTION Seeking Prospective Equitable Relief as a Permanent Injunction for Infringement of Intellectual Property filed by Merlin Williams. (triver)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Appoint Counsel Fri 05/31 3:35 PM
MOTION for Appoint of Counsel filed by Merlin Williams. (triver)
Related: [-]
6 6 cmp Complaint Prisoner (1983) Fri 05/31 3:31 PM
Prisoner COMPLAINT against State of Mississippi, filed by Merlin Williams. (triver)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Letter,
Att: 2 Envelope
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
5 5 utility Clerk's Office Acknowledgment of Receipt Thu 04/25 4:22 PM
Acknowledgment of Receipt issued and mailed to Plaintiff. (triver)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Miscellaneous Relief (MOTION) Thu 04/25 4:20 PM
MOTION Seeking Prospective Equitable Relief as Permanent Injunction for Infringement of Intellectual Property filed by Merlin Williams. (triver)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
3 3 motion Appoint Counsel Thu 04/25 4:15 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Merlin Williams. (triver)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 04/25 4:09 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Merlin Williams. (triver)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Prisoner (1983) Thu 04/25 4:04 PM
Prisoner COMPLAINT against State of Mississippi, filed by Merlin Williams. (triver)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Prisoner Data Sheet,
Att: 2 Envelope