Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 1:24-mj-00253
Case Filed:Apr 24, 2024
Last checked: Friday Apr 26, 2024 2:22 AM CDT
Defendant
Alejandra Anahi Castillo (1)
Represented By
Alfredo Padilla
Alfredo Padilla, Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Asst United States Attorney Br-Mag Duty
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 3:09 AM CDT
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen Betancourt: INITIAL APPEARANCE on Complaint held on 4/24/2024 as to Alejandra Anahi Castillo. Defendant sworn in. Defendant's First Appearance; advised of charges and rights. COUNSEL DETERMINATION HEARING held. Defendant examined by U.S. Probation Office. Defendant requests court appointed counsel. After review of Defendant's Financial Affidavit, the Court finds the defendant qualifies for the appointment of counsel. The Court will appoint counsel to represent the Defendant. In the event the defendant is able to hire private counsel, deft shall reimburse appointed counsel for costs incurred up to such time that new counsel enters his/her appearance. Preliminary Examination Hearing set for 4/29/2024 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Ignacio Torteya, III. Defendant held without bond. Detention Hearing set for 4/29/2024 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Ignacio Torteya, III. In accordance with Rule 5(f), as amended by the Due Process Protections Act, on October 21, 2020, counsel for the United States is hereby notified of and is ordered to comply with disclosure obligations under Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny and the possible consequences of violating this order. Deft remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal. Appearances: Paul Marian, AUSA (USPO:Nelli Elizondo) (ERO:Bertha Vasquez) (Interpreter:Constanza Raber, not used) (DUSM: R Palomino) (CSO: J Morin) (als1) (9:33-10:05AM)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Alejandra Anahi Castillo (1), filed. (Cameron) (bav1) (edg1).
Related: [-]
2 2 AO 257 Information Sheet as to Alejandra Anahi Castillo arrested on 4/23/2024, filed. (bav1) (edg1).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (4/24/2024) Unredacted attachment
3 3 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Alejandra Anahi Castillo, filed.
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL for Defendant Alejandra Anahi Castillo. Alfredo Padilla appointed. ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Betancourt) Parties notified. (als1)
Related: [-]
5 5 BRADY ORDER on Rule 5(f) as to Alejandra Anahi Castillo ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Betancourt) Parties notified. (als1)
Related: [-]