Washington Western District Court
Case #: 2:24-mj-00241
Case Filed:Apr 24, 2024
Terminated:Apr 24, 2024
Last checked: Friday Apr 26, 2024 12:44 AM PDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Cecelia Youngberg Gregson
United States Attorney'S Office (sea)
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Michael Posey (1)
Terminated: 04/24/2024
Represented By
Sara Brin
Federal Public Defender'S Office (sea)
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/29/2024 11:43 AM PDT
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
Arrest of Michael Posey on 4/24/2024. (TLJ)
Related: [-]
1 1 21 pgs CHARGING DOCUMENT RECEIVED from The District of Maine as to Michael Posey. (TLJ)
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER appointing Sara Brin for Michael Posey. On the basis of the defendant's sworn financial statement, the court finds that they are financially unable to retain counsel. It is hereby ORDERED that the Federal Public Defender for the Western District of Washington be and hereby is appointed to represent the defendant pursuant to Title 18 United States Code 3006A. Approved by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. (No.pdf image attached) (TLJ)
Related: [-]
5 5 MOTION for Detention by USA as to Michael Posey.(TLJ)
Related: [-]
6 6 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Michelle L. Peterson- CRD: T. Johnson ; AUSA: Cecelia Gregson ; Def Cnsl: Sara Brin ; PTS: Erin O'Donnell ; Court Reporter: Digital Recording ; Time of Hearing: 2:00PM ; Courtroom: 12B ; INITIAL APPEARANCE IN RULE 5(c)(3) PROCEEDINGS as to Michael Posey held on 4/24/2024. Defendant present in custody. Defendant advised of rights. Financial Affidavit reviewed. Counsel appointed. Defendant advised of charges and penalties in the District of Maine. The government moves for detention5 . Defendant waives Identity Hearing and his right to a detention hearing in this district. Defendant stipulates to detention. Court signs Order of Transfer. No detention hearing was held and the government's motion is MOOT. Defendant shall remain in custody until his first appearance in the district where charges are pending. (TLJ)
Related: [-]
7 7 WAIVER OF RULE 5 HEARINGS AND ORDER OF TRANSFER to the District of Maine as to Michael Posey by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. (cc: PTS, USMO) (TLJ)
Related: [-]
8 8 LETTER to the District of Maine regarding Rule 5 Transfer as to defendant Michael Posey. (TLJ)
Related: [-]