California Northern District Court
Judge:Jeffrey S White
Case #: 4:24-cv-02263
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause08:1329 Writ of Mandamus to Adjudicate Visa Petition
Case Filed:Apr 16, 2024
Terminated:May 24, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Oct 13, 2024 2:09 AM PDT
Defendant
Donna P. Campagnolo
Defendant
Ur Mendoza Jaddou
Defendant
United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Plaintiff
Weitian Xie
Represented By
Christina Sullivan Castro
Hacking Immigration Law LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, May 24, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 05/24 2:16 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by Weitian Xie (Castro, Christina)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
10 10 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 04/25 3:24 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Virgina K. DeMarchi no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.(smc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Thu 04/25 1:38 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Weitian Xie. Donna P. Campagnolo served on 4/22/2024, answer due 6/21/2024; Ur Mendoza Jaddou served on 4/24/2024, answer due 6/24/2024; United States Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 4/24/2024, answer due 6/24/2024.(Castro, Christina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Certified mail receipts
8 8 utility ~Util - Notice Assigning/ Reassigning Case (CRJ) Thu 04/25 11:39 AM
This case will be randomly reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at[LINK:https://cand.uscourts.gov/notices/northern-district-extends-caseload-rebalancing-pilot-program/] . (smc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
7 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (amk, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
6 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Weitian Xie.. (Castro, Christina)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
4 4 Summons Issued as to Donna P. Campagnolo, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
5 5 Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order, attached form Consent or Declination to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction (cv, COURT STAFF) Modified on 4/24/2024 (cv, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
3 3 Proposed Summons. (Castro, Christina)
Related: [-]
2 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/30/2024. (cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against Donna P. Campagnolo, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19324819.). Filed by Weitian Xie.(Castro, Christina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet