Original Case: 4:19-cv-00075

Eighth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:24-cv-01864
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Case Filed:Apr 25, 2024
Last checked: Friday Apr 26, 2024 3:17 AM CDT
Defendant - Appellee
Barnes Jewish Hospital
Represented By
Theresa Marie Mullineaux
HUSCH & BLACKWELL
contact info
Blake Armstrong
HUSCH & BLACKWELL
contact info
Michael P. Nolan
HUSCH & BLACKWELL
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
BJC Healthcare
Represented By
Theresa Marie Mullineaux
HUSCH & BLACKWELL
contact info
Blake Armstrong
HUSCH & BLACKWELL
contact info
Michael P. Nolan
HUSCH & BLACKWELL
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Washington University, also known as Washington University School of Medicine
Represented By
Kevin Anthony Sullivan
SHANDS & ELBERT
contact info
Mark Jonathan Bremer
SHANDS & ELBERT
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Thomas Cox
Represented By
Kevin Anthony Sullivan
SHANDS & ELBERT
contact info
Mark Jonathan Bremer
SHANDS & ELBERT
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Richard Benzinger
Represented By
Kevin Anthony Sullivan
SHANDS & ELBERT
contact info
Mark Jonathan Bremer
SHANDS & ELBERT
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Alex Evers
Represented By
Kevin Anthony Sullivan
SHANDS & ELBERT
contact info
Mark Jonathan Bremer
SHANDS & ELBERT
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Jeffery Weisman
Represented By
Sanford Jay Boxerman
NEILL & SCHWERIN
contact info
Teresa Dale Pupillo
CAPES & SOKOL
contact info
Edward R. Moor
MOOR LAW OFFICE PC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Strategic Biomedical, Inc.
Represented By
Edward R. Moor
MOOR LAW OFFICE PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 3:17 AM CDT
Thursday, April 25, 2024
5 pgs Civil case docketed. [5387038] 24-1864 (RDB)
Related: [-]
30+ pgs Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Order dated 5/29/2020, Order dated 3/22/2022, Order dated 3/22/2022, Order dated 10/12/2022, Order dated 8/4/2023, Order dated 3/25/2024, Judgment dated 3/25/2024. [5387041] 24-1864 (RDB)
Related: [-]
2 pgs BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS:
Transcript due on or before 06/04/2024. Appendix due 06/14/2024. BRIEF APPELLANT, Strategic Biomedical, Inc. and Jeffery Weisman due 06/14/2024
Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant.
[5387045] 24-1864 (RDB)
Related: [-]
1 pgs APPEARANCE filed by Teresa Dale Pupillo for Appellants Strategic Biomedical, Inc. and Jeffery Weisman w/service 04/25/2024 [5387364] 24-1864 (TDP)
Related: [-]