Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Wendy W Berger
Referred: Robert M Norway
Case #: 6:24-cv-00783
Nature of Suit220 Real Property - Foreclosure
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Case Filed:Apr 26, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Oct 26, 2024 7:00 AM EDT
Defendant
Dockside at Ventura Condominium Association, Inc.
Orlando, FL 32801
Represented By
Thomas Charles Allison
Thomas C. Allison, P.A.
contact info
Erin Hyde
Erin Hyde, P.A.
contact info
Luis Miguel Perez
Thomas C. Allison, P.A.
contact info
Mediator
Jeffrey E. Streitfeld
Represented By
Jeffrey Earl Streitfeld
contact info
Plaintiff
SFR Services L.L.C.
Represented By
Joshua Bryan Alper
Shapiro, Blasi, Wasserman & Hermann, P.A.
contact info
Bradley Pepper
Bradley Pepper, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, May 19, 2025
49 49 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Mon 05/19 3:12 PM
ENDORSED ORDER terminating 38 Verified Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement in light of 48 Notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 5/19/2025. (CHM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
48 48 misc Notice of Withdrawal of Motion Tue 05/06 12:52 PM
NOTICE of WITHDRAWAL of motion re38 Motion for Miscellaneous Relieffiled by SFR Services L.L.C. by SFR Services L.L.C. (Alper, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
47 47 order Order Thu 12/19 2:09 PM
ENDORSED ORDER STRIKING 46 Notice. This filing is not required or authorized by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway on 12/19/2024. (JBS)
Related: [-]
46 46 notice Notice (Other) Thu 12/19 9:48 AM
NOTICE of Serving Proposal for Settlement by SFR Services L.L.C. (Alper, Joshua) Modified on 12/19/2024 as to docket text (ARL)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
45 45 adr Mediation report Mon 12/02 3:25 PM
MEDIATION report Hearing held on November 25, 2024. Hearing outcome: Impasse.. (Alper, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
44 44 respm Response to motion Mon 10/28 4:46 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re38 Verified MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically to Enforce Settlement Agreement and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Dockside at Ventura Condominium Association, Inc.(on behalf of all Owners of Units Located in the Dockside at Ventura Condominium Community), Dockside at Ventura Condominium Association, Inc.(individually). (Allison, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
43 43 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Compel Mon 10/21 3:18 PM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's 30 Motion to Compel Production of Documents. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway on 10/21/2024. (MLS)
Related: [-]
41 41 minutes Motion Hearing Mon 10/21 3:04 PM
Minute Entry. In Person Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway: MOTION HEARING held on 10/21/2024 re30 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Pursuant to Rule 26 and the Court's Case Managment and Scheduling Order and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by SFR Services L.L.C. (Digital) (LDJ)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
40 40 notice Notice of mediation conference/hearing Thu 10/17 11:05 AM
NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on November 25, 2024 at 9 AM ET before Judge Jeffrey Streitfeld. (Allison, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
39 39 notice Notice (Other) Wed 10/16 2:02 PM
NOTICE by Dockside at Ventura Condominium Association, Inc.(on behalf of all Owners of Units Located in the Dockside at Ventura Condominium Community), Dockside at Ventura Condominium Association, Inc.(individually) Notice of Cancellation of Mediation (Allison, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 14, 2024
38 38 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 10/14 4:14 PM
Verified MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically to Enforce Settlement Agreement and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by SFR Services L.L.C..(Alper, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Settlement Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Ruano State Court Action,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Dockside Amended Complaint,
Att: 4 Exhibit D- SFR Amended Complaint
Friday, October 11, 2024
37 37 order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Fri 10/11 9:28 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 36 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Erin Hyde is terminated from this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway on 10/11/2024. (JBS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
36 36 motion Withdraw as Attorney Thu 10/10 7:28 PM
MOTION for Erin Hyde to Withdraw as Attorney by Dockside at Ventura Condominium Association, Inc.(on behalf of all Owners of Units Located in the Dockside at Ventura Condominium Community). (Hyde, Erin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
35 35 misc Certificate of compliance Tue 10/08 9:14 AM
CERTIFICATE of compliance re30 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Pursuant to Rule 26 and the Court's Case Managment and Scheduling Order and Incorporated Memorandum of Law Supplemental Certificate of Compliance With Local Rule 3.01(G) by SFR Services L.L.C.. (Alper, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
34 34 respoth Response Mon 10/07 5:09 PM
RESPONSE re32 Notice (Other) filed by Dockside at Ventura Condominium Association, Inc.(on behalf of all Owners of Units Located in the Dockside at Ventura Condominium Community), Dockside at Ventura Condominium Association, Inc.(individually). (Allison, Thomas)
Related: [-]
33 33 notice Notice of Hearing on Motion Mon 10/07 4:12 PM
NOTICE of hearing on motion re (22 in 6:24-cv-00086-WWB-RMN) MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Pursuant to Rule 26 and the Court's Case Managment and Scheduling Order and Incorporated Memorandum of Law , (29 in 6:24-cv-00777-WWB-RMN) MOTION to Compel Production of Documents , (30 in 6:24-cv-00783-WWB-RMN) MOTION to Compel Production of Documents . Motion Hearing set for 10/21/2024 at 01:30 PM in Orlando Courtroom 3 C before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway. If the parties intend to order a transcript, please notify the courtroom deputy before the hearing to have a court reporter present. (LDJ)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
32 32 notice Notice (Other) Wed 10/02 5:00 PM
NOTICE by SFR Services L.L.C. re30 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Pursuant to Rule 26 and the Court's Case Managment and Scheduling Order and Incorporated Memorandum of Law ,31 Response in Opposition to Motion Notice of Filing Emails Between Counsel Regarding Conferral Efforts Prior to Plaintiff's Filing Their Motion To Compel Production of Documents Pursuant to Rule 26 In Compliance with Local Rule 3.01(Alper, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A- Emails Between Counsel
31 31 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 10/02 3:05 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re30 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Pursuant to Rule 26 and the Court's Case Managment and Scheduling Order and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Dockside at Ventura Condominium Association, Inc.(on behalf of all Owners of Units Located in the Dockside at Ventura Condominium Community), Dockside at Ventura Condominium Association, Inc.(individually).(Allison, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
30 30 motion Compel Wed 09/18 2:22 PM
MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Pursuant to Rule 26 and the Court's Case Managment and Scheduling Order and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by SFR Services L.L.C..(Alper, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A- Dockside's Initial Rule 26 Disclosures
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
29 29 notice Notice of mediation conference/hearing Wed 08/28 2:24 PM
NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on October 23, 2024 at 9 AM ET before Judge Jeffrey Streitfeld. (Allison, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
28 28 order Case Management Scheduling Order Tue 08/20 11:33 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 9/24/2024 Joinder of Parties due by 9/24/2024 Discovery due by 10/3/2025 Dispositive motions due by 11/4/2025 Pretrial statement due by 3/9/2026 All other motions due by 2/6/2026 Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 8/5/2025 Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 9/4/2025 Trial Status Conference set for 3/10/2026 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 3 B before Judge Wendy W. Berger Jury Trial set for the April 2026 trial term commencing on 4/6/2026 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 3 B before Judge Wendy W. Berger. Conduct mediation hearing by 10/17/2025. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 8/20/2024. (RMF)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
27 27 answer Answer to amended complaint Fri 08/02 5:43 PM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 25 Amended Complaint by Dockside at Ventura Condominium Association, Inc.(on behalf of all Owners of Units Located in the Dockside at Ventura Condominium Community).(Allison, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
26 26 misc Case Management Report Tue 07/23 9:56 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Alper, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
25 25 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 07/19 8:48 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Dockside at Ventura Condominium Association, Inc.(individually) with Jury Demand. filed by SFR Services L.L.C.. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by SFR Services L.L.C..(Alper, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Wind Claim Roofing Contract,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Wind Claim LOP,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C - November Wind Claim Exterior and Interior Estimate,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Re-Roof Invoice,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Wind Claim LOP Cancellation
24 24 order Order on Motion to Amend / Correct / Modify / Supplement Fri 07/19 9:36 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting in part and denying in part 23 the Joint Motion for Relief from Order Dismissing Case. Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 may not be used to dismiss less than all of the claims in a case. Nevertheless, in the interests of justice the Court vacates its 22 July 18, 2024 Order dismissing this case. The Clerk is directed to reopen this case for further proceedings. On or before July 22, 2024, Plaintiff may file an amended pleading to remove the settled claims. The parties are cautioned that all future failures to comply with all applicable rules and orders, including this Court's January 13, 2021 Standing Order, may result in the striking or denial of filings without notice or leave to refile. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 7/19/2024. (MDJ)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
23 23 motion Amend / Correct / Modify / Supplement Thu 07/18 6:33 PM
Joint MOTION to Correct22 Order Dismissing Case Joint Motion for Relief from Order by SFR Services L.L.C.. (Alper, Joshua)
Related: [-]
22 22 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 07/18 4:27 PM
ORDER Dismissing Case re 19 Joint Stipulation for Entry of Final Order. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), the Clerk is directed to terminate all pending motions and close this case. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 7/18/2024. (RMF)
Related: [-]
21 21 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response / Reply Thu 07/18 1:16 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting Plaintiff's 20 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall respond to Defendant's 18 Motion to Dismiss on or before August 12, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway on 7/18/2024. (MLS)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Extension of Time to File Response / Reply Thu 07/18 11:53 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by SFR Services L.L.C.. (Alper, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
19 19 misc Stipulation Fri 07/12 8:19 AM
STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL ORDER by SFR Services L.L.C..(Alper, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Final Order - Exhibit A
Monday, July 01, 2024
18 18 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 07/01 10:09 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Dockside at Ventura Condominium Association, Inc.(on behalf of all Owners of Units Located in the Dockside at Ventura Condominium Community), Dockside at Ventura Condominium Association, Inc.(individually). (Allison, Thomas)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Mon 07/01 9:34 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting Plaintiff's 16 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties shall file their Joint Case Management Report on or before July 23, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway on 7/1/2024. (MLS)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2024
16 16 motion Extension of Time to File Fri 06/28 4:41 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Case Management Report by SFR Services L.L.C.. (Alper, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
15 15 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 06/25 9:59 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting Defendant's 14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before July 1, 2024. Future extension motions in this case shall be filed more than three business days before the expiring deadline and must demonstrate the movant's diligence in meeting the deadline in addition to good cause. Further, future motions shall comply with the requirements of the Local Rules, including the Local Rule 3.01(a) requirement that motions contain a legal memorandum. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway on 6/25/2024. (MLS)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
14 14 motion Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Complaint Mon 06/24 3:50 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by All Defendants. (Allison, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of appearance Fri 05/24 4:33 PM
NOTICE of Co-Counsel Appearance by Erin Hyde on behalf of Dockside at Ventura Condominium Association, Inc.(on behalf of all Owners of Units Located in the Dockside at Ventura Condominium Community) (Hyde, Erin)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 05/24 3:49 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Dockside at Ventura Condominium Association, Inc.(on behalf of all Owners of Units Located in the Dockside at Ventura Condominium Community), Dockside at Ventura Condominium Association, Inc.(individually). (Allison, Thomas)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of appearance Fri 05/24 3:48 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Charles Allison on behalf of Dockside at Ventura Condominium Association, Inc.(on behalf of all Owners of Units Located in the Dockside at Ventura Condominium Community), Dockside at Ventura Condominium Association, Inc.(individually) (Allison, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
10 10 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Mon 05/20 5:14 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (RMF)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Order Mon 05/20 5:14 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: The Middle District of Florida's revised Local Rules become effective February 1, 2021 and can be found on the Court's public website https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/local-rules. Additionally, the undersigned has issued Standing Orders, available at https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/judges/wendy-berger, that apply to all proceedings before the undersigned. For a just and efficient resolution of this case, the parties are DIRECTED to read and comply with the Middle District of Florida's Local Rules and this Court's Standing Orders. See Local Rule 1.01(a). Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 5/20/2024. (RMF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
8 8 service Waiver of service executed Tue 05/14 1:16 PM
WAIVER of service returned executed on 5/14/2024 by SFR Services L.L.C. as to All Defendants.(Alper, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Additional Defendant's Waiver
Monday, April 29, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of a Related Action Mon 04/29 2:30 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by SFR Services L.L.C.. Related case(s): Yes (Alper, Joshua)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Mon 04/29 2:28 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Joshua Bryan Alper on behalf of SFR Services L.L.C.. Lead Counsel: Joshua B. Alper, Esq.. (Alper, Joshua)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 04/29 2:26 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by SFR Services L.L.C.. (Alper, Joshua)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Mon 04/29 11:49 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Bradley Pepper, Joshua Bryan Alper of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (EVK)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons issued Mon 04/29 11:47 AM
SUMMONS issued as to All Defendants. (EVK)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 04/26 3:33 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Wendy W. Berger and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway. New case number: 6:24-cv-783-WWB-RMN. (AA)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 04/26 12:30 PM
COMPLAINT against Dockside at Ventura Condominium Association, Inc.(on behalf of all Owners of Units Located in the Dockside at Ventura Condominium Community), Dockside at Ventura Condominium Association, Inc.(Individually) with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-22028733) filed by SFR Services L.L.C..(Alper, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Wind Claim Roofing Contract,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - November Wind Claim Exterior and Interior Estimate,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Wind Claim LOP,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Re-Roof Invoice,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Wind Claim LOP Cancellation,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Claim of Lien,
Att: 7 Exhibit G - Correspondence with Enclosures,
Att: 8 Exhibit H - Correspondence with Enclosures,
Att: 9 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 10 Proposed Summons to Dockside, Individually,
Att: 11 Proposed Summons to Dockside, obo Unit Owners