Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Beth Bloom
Case #: 1:24-cv-21614
Nature of Suit120 Contract - Marine
Cause28:1333 Admiralty
Case Filed:Apr 26, 2024
Terminated:Mar 07, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Oct 26, 2024 1:41 PM EDT
Defendant
Redbridge Insurance Company Ltd.
Represented By
Robert G. Post
Post & Romero
contact info
Garnishee
Firstbank Florida
Represented By
Baris John Okcular
Liebler Gonzalez & Portuondo PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Ital Brokers S.P.A.
Represented By
Andrew Robert Spector
Spector Rubin, P.A.
contact info
Thomas L. Tisdale
Tisdale & Nast Law Offices, LLC
contact info
Spencer James Wellborn
Spector Rubin, P.A.
contact info

GPO Nov 25 2024
/I> (jas)ORDER granting 32 Motion for Leave to Take Jurisdictional Discovery; denying 23 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Case stayed for 60 days. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 11/25/2024. See attached document for full details.<

Docket last updated: 26 minutes ago
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
44 44 2 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Tue 03/25 3:26 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. CASE CLOSED. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 3/25/2025. See attached document for full details. (caw)
Related: [-]
43 43 misc Stipulation of Dismissal - aty Tue 03/25 12:33 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint) by Ital Brokers S.P.A. (Spector, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
42 42 2 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Mon 03/10 11:27 AM
ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 3/7/2025. See attached document for full details. (caw)
Related: [-]
41 41 2 pgs notice Notice of Settlement - aty Fri 03/07 11:35 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by Ital Brokers S.P.A. (Spector, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
40 40 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 12/30 11:23 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting39 Plaintiff's Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery. The Case is stayed until March 10, 2025 to allow the parties to complete jurisdictional discovery. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (jkk)
Related: [-]
39 39 motion Extension of Time Mon 12/30 10:28 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time for Jurisdictional Discovery re38 Order on Motion for Discovery,, Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, by Ital Brokers S.P.A.. Responses due by 1/13/2025.(Spector, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, November 25, 2024
38 38 15 pgs order Order on Motion for Discovery Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Mon 11/25 12:12 PM
ORDER granting32 Motion for Leave to Take Jurisdictional Discovery; denying23 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Case stayed for 60 days. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 11/25/2024. See attached document for full details. (jas)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
37 37 9 pgs respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 10/07 11:46 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re32 MOTION for Discovery (Jurisdictional) filed by Ital Brokers S.P.A..(Wellborn, Spencer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Vergani
Monday, September 30, 2024
36 36 5 pgs respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 09/30 1:24 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re32 MOTION for Discovery (Jurisdictional) filed by Redbridge Insurance Company Ltd.. Replies due by 10/7/2024.(Post, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
35 35 3 pgs respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 09/24 10:24 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Redbridge Insurance Company Ltd.. (Post, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
34 34 12 pgs respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 09/17 11:41 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Ital Brokers S.P.A.. Replies due by 9/24/2024.(Wellborn, Spencer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Vergani,
Att: 2 Affidavit Tasso,
Att: 3 Affidavit Fraia
33 33 2 pgs notice Notice (Other) Tue 09/17 11:39 AM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Opposition Memorandum (ECF 31) by Ital Brokers S.P.A. re31 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Wellborn, Spencer)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
32 32 8 pgs motion Discovery Mon 09/16 3:35 PM
MOTION for Discovery (Jurisdictional) by Ital Brokers S.P.A.. Responses due by 9/30/2024. (Wellborn, Spencer)
Related: [-]
31 31 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 09/16 2:14 PM
WITHDRAWN: RESPONSE in Opposition re24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Ital Brokers S.P.A.. Replies due by 9/23/2024.(Wellborn, Spencer) Modified text per DE33 Notice of Withdrawal on 9/17/2024 (caw).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Vergani,
Att: 2 Affidavit Tasso,
Att: 3 Affidavit Fraia
Friday, September 06, 2024
30 30 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Fri 09/06 5:23 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting Plaintiff's Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, ECF No.28 . Plaintiff shall file a response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, ECF No.23 , no later than September 17, 2024. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (jkk)
Related: [-]
29 29 notice Notice of Compliance Fri 09/06 11:28 AM
NOTICE of Compliance by Ital Brokers S.P.A. re19 Order, Set/Reset Deadlines (Spector, Andrew)
Related: [-]
28 28 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Fri 09/06 11:18 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to23 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Ital Brokers S.P.A..(Spector, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, August 26, 2024
27 27 order Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Mon 08/26 3:20 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER terminating ECF No.24 Notice of Filing Affidavit of Edmund Santiago (Note: document was erroneously filed as a motion). Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ab04)
Related: [-]
26 26 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Mon 08/26 3:15 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting ECF No.25 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff must file its Response by September 10, 2024. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ab04)
Related: [-]
25 25 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Mon 08/26 3:08 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ,23 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Ital Brokers S.P.A..(Wellborn, Spencer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
24 24 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Tue 08/20 8:05 AM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Redbridge Insurance Company Ltd.. Responses due by 9/3/2024.(Post, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Affidavit,
Att: 2 21 pgs Exhibit A
23 23 6 pgs motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Tue 08/20 8:02 AM
Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Redbridge Insurance Company Ltd.. Responses due by 9/3/2024. (Post, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
22 22 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 08/07 3:08 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Redbridge Insurance Company Ltd. (Post, Robert)
Related: [-]
21 21 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Wed 08/07 9:36 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting ECF No.20 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendant must file its Response by August 21, 2024. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ab04)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Wed 08/07 8:57 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Complaint, by Redbridge Insurance Company Ltd.. Attorney Robert G. Post added to party Redbridge Insurance Company Ltd.(pty:dft).(Post, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
utility ~Util - Set/Reset Response/Answer Due Deadline Wed 08/07 11:05 AM
Set Response Due Deadline per DE 21 Order: Redbridge Insurance Company Ltd. response due 8/21/2024. (kpe)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
19 19 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 07/29 3:39 PM
ORDER TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE. Deadline to file Proof of Service 9/6/2024. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 7/29/2024. See attached document for full details. (caw)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
18 18 misc Status Report Mon 07/08 10:11 AM
STATUS REPORT by Ital Brokers S.P.A. (Spector, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
17 17 order Status Report Order Mon 07/01 11:45 AM
ORDER TO FILE STATUS REPORT REGARDING SERVICE UPON FOREIGN DEFENDANTS. Status Report due by 7/8/2024. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 6/28/2024. See attached document for full details. (jas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
16 16 2 pgs respoth Answer to Writ of Garnishment Wed 06/05 4:54 PM
ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment by Firstbank Florida. Reply/Objections to Writ Answer due by 6/25/2024. (Okcular, Baris)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
15 15 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Mon 05/20 10:03 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Ital Brokers S.P.A.. Firstbank Florida served on 5/15/2024, response/answer due 6/5/2024. (Wellborn, Spencer)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
14 14 service Acknowledgment of Service Fri 05/17 11:59 AM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to13 Writ of Garnishment filed by Ital Brokers S.P.A.. (Spector, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
13 13 1 pgs order Writ of Garnishment Issued (or Clks Ntc of Non-Issuance) Tue 05/14 3:57 PM
SUMMONS AND PROCESS OF MARITIME ATTACHMENT AND GARNISHMENT THEPRESIDENT OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA issued as to Garnishee FIRSTBANK FLORIDA in the amount of $ $2,744,045.48, re:11 Order on Motion for Writ. (caw)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
12 12 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Mon 05/13 12:46 PM
ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. RULE 4(C). Appointing as Special Process Server: Thomas L. Tisdale and Timothy J. Nast of Tisdale & Nast Law Offices, LLC and Andrew Spector or any other partner, associate, counsel, paralegal or agent of Tisdale & Nast Law Offices, LLC and Spector Rubin P.A. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 5/10/2024. See attached document for full details. (caw)
Related: [-]
11 11 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Writ Mon 05/13 12:38 PM
EX PARTE ORDER GRANTING7 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION for Writ on Maritime Attachment and Garnishment. (Not Sealed.) Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 5/10/2024. See attached document for full details. (caw)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
9 9 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/29 2:37 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting ECF No.8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Thomas L. Tisdale. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ab04)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice - aty Mon 04/29 1:42 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Thomas L. Tisdale. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-17486404 by ITAL BROKERS S.P.A.. Responses due by 5/13/2024.(Wellborn, Spencer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification Rule 4(b)(1) Certification,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
7 7 motion Writ (of Garnishment/Execution/Other) Mon 04/29 11:34 AM
MOTION for Writ on Maritime Attachment and Garnishment by ITAL BROKERS S.P.A..(Wellborn, Spencer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum Memorandum of Law,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Ex Parte Order For Process of Maritime Attachment,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order Order Appointing Special Process Server
6 6 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 04/29 10:12 AM
Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement by ITAL BROKERS S.P.A. identifying Corporate Parent Duferco Italia Holding S.p.a., Corporate Parent La Sesta Trust- Lichestein, Corporate Parent Ultima Holding S.A.- Luxemberg, Corporate Parent Ship Atlantic Holding S.A.- Luxemburg, Corporate Parent Duferco Energia S.p.a.- Italy, Corporate Parent Sider Navi S.r.l- Italy for ITAL BROKERS S.P.A. (Spector, Andrew)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Bar Letter Mon 04/29 9:52 AM
Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Thomas L. Tisdale, mailing date April 29, 2024, (pt)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 04/29 9:34 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Spencer James Wellborn on behalf of ITAL BROKERS S.P.A.. Attorney Spencer James Wellborn added to party ITAL BROKERS S.P.A.(pty:pla). (Wellborn, Spencer)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
10 10 6 pgs order Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Mon 04/29 2:58 PM
ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 4/26/2024. See attached document for full details. (caw)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 04/26 4:35 PM
Summons Issued as to REDBRIDGE INSURANCE COMPANY LTD.. (ar24)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Fri 04/26 4:27 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Marty Fulgueira Elfenbein is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (ar24)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 04/26 2:39 PM
COMPLAINT against REDBRIDGE INSURANCE COMPANY LTD.. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number BFLSDC-17482440, filed by ITAL BROKERS S.P.A..(Spector, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 6 pgs Exhibit 1- Email Communication,
Att: 2 40 pgs Exhibit 2- Tasso Declaration,
Att: 3 27 pgs Exhibit 3- Nast Declaration,
Att: 4 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 5 2 pgs Summon(s) Barbados