Louisiana Eastern District Court
Judge:Lance M Africk
Referred: Michael North
Case #: 2:24-cv-01068
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Apr 26, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Oct 26, 2024 12:58 PM CDT
Defendant
Mignon Faget, LTD
Represented By
M. Suzanne Montero
Sternberg Naccari & White
contact info
Scott L. Sternberg
Sternberg, Naccari & White LLC
contact info
Chelsea B. Cusimano
Sternberg, Naccari, And White LLC
contact info
Graham Halsey Williams
Sternberg Naccari & White
contact info
Plaintiff
Shelby Webb Cox
Represented By
Allison A. Jones
Downer, Jones, Marino & Wilhite, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, May 02, 2025
85 85 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Fri 05/02 10:48 AM
ORDER granting84 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Exhibits to Opposition. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 05/01/2025. (ko)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
84 84 motion Leave to File Document Wed 04/30 4:57 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Exhibits to Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs by Mignon Faget, LTD.(Montero, M.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Proposed Pleading Proposed Exhibit,
Att: 3 Proposed Pleading Proposed Exhibit,
Att: 4 Proposed Pleading Proposed Exhibit,
Att: 5 Proposed Pleading Proposed Exhibit
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
83 83 respm Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Tue 04/29 4:45 PM
RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Mignon Faget, LTD re80 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Expenses .(Montero, M.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit,
Att: 7 Exhibit,
Att: 8 Exhibit,
Att: 9 Exhibit,
Att: 10 Exhibit
82 82 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Deadlines Tue 04/29 2:43 PM
ORDER granting81 Motion for Extension of Deadlines. The deadline for filing the revised briefing in connection with the aforementioned motions is continued to 05/30/2025. The motions shall be deemed submitted on that date. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 04/29/2025. (ko)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
81 81 motion Extension of Deadlines Mon 04/28 10:11 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Deadlines by Mignon Faget, LTD.(Cusimano, Chelsea)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order